EP4015034 - LEADLESS CAPSULE AUTONOMOUS CARDIAC IMPLANT, COMPRISING AN INTERFACE FOR BATTERY RECHARGING AND EXTERNAL COMMUNICATION DURING TRANSPORT AND STORAGE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.10.2023 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 11.11.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 12.10.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.05.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 30.10.2024 [2024/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cairdac Centre D'Affaires Renaissance - BÂT. D 8, rue de la Renaissance 92160 Antony / FR | [2022/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Makdissi, Alaa 75011 Paris / FR | 02 /
Regnier, Willy 91160 Longjumeau / FR | 03 /
Nguyen-Dinh, An 37520 La Riche / FR | [2022/25] | Representative(s) | Dupuis-Latour, Dominique, et al Bardehle Pagenberg SPE SAS SO Square Opéra 5, rue Boudreau 75009 Paris / FR | [2022/25] | Application number, filing date | 20315507.2 | 28.12.2020 | [2022/46] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4015034 | Date: | 22.06.2022 | Language: | FR | [2022/25] | Type: | A8 Corrected patent application | No.: | EP4015034 | Date: | 23.11.2022 | [2022/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4015034 | Date: | 14.12.2022 | Language: | FR | [2022/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.06.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A61N1/372, A61N1/375, A61N1/378 | [2022/25] | CPC: |
A61N1/3756 (EP,US);
A61N1/3785 (EP,US);
A61N1/0565 (US);
A61N1/37205 (EP,US);
A61N1/37223 (US);
A61N1/37512 (US);
A61N1/3787 (US);
H02J7/32 (US);
A61N1/36139 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/25] | Title | German: | AUTONOMES HERZIMPLANTAT VOM TYP LEITUNGSLOSE KAPSEL MIT EINER SCHNITTSTELLE ZUM AUFLADEN DER BATTERIE UND ZUR EXTERNEN KOMMUNIKATION WÄHREND DES TRANSPORTS UND DER LAGERUNG | [2022/25] | English: | LEADLESS CAPSULE AUTONOMOUS CARDIAC IMPLANT, COMPRISING AN INTERFACE FOR BATTERY RECHARGING AND EXTERNAL COMMUNICATION DURING TRANSPORT AND STORAGE | [2022/25] | French: | IMPLANT CARDIAQUE AUTONOME DE TYPE CAPSULE LEADLESS, COMPRENANT UNE INTERFACE DE RECHARGE DE BATTERIE ET DE COMMUNICATION EXTERNE PENDANT LE TRANSPORT ET LE STOCKAGE | [2022/25] | Examination procedure | 07.07.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.07.2021 | Examination requested [2022/25] | 07.07.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 13.10.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.10.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 26.10.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 26.10.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP21185223.1 / EP4015036 | Opposition(s) | 15.09.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/47] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 14.12.2022 | AT | 14.12.2022 | BG | 14.12.2022 | CY | 14.12.2022 | CZ | 14.12.2022 | DK | 14.12.2022 | EE | 14.12.2022 | ES | 14.12.2022 | FI | 14.12.2022 | HR | 14.12.2022 | LT | 14.12.2022 | LV | 14.12.2022 | MC | 14.12.2022 | MK | 14.12.2022 | MT | 14.12.2022 | NL | 14.12.2022 | PL | 14.12.2022 | RO | 14.12.2022 | RS | 14.12.2022 | SE | 14.12.2022 | SI | 14.12.2022 | SK | 14.12.2022 | SM | 14.12.2022 | TR | 14.12.2022 | LU | 28.12.2022 | BE | 31.12.2022 | NO | 14.03.2023 | GR | 15.03.2023 | IS | 14.04.2023 | PT | 14.04.2023 | [2024/44] |
Former [2024/34] | AL | 14.12.2022 | |
AT | 14.12.2022 | ||
BG | 14.12.2022 | ||
CY | 14.12.2022 | ||
CZ | 14.12.2022 | ||
DK | 14.12.2022 | ||
EE | 14.12.2022 | ||
ES | 14.12.2022 | ||
FI | 14.12.2022 | ||
HR | 14.12.2022 | ||
LT | 14.12.2022 | ||
LV | 14.12.2022 | ||
MC | 14.12.2022 | ||
MK | 14.12.2022 | ||
NL | 14.12.2022 | ||
PL | 14.12.2022 | ||
RO | 14.12.2022 | ||
RS | 14.12.2022 | ||
SE | 14.12.2022 | ||
SI | 14.12.2022 | ||
SK | 14.12.2022 | ||
SM | 14.12.2022 | ||
TR | 14.12.2022 | ||
LU | 28.12.2022 | ||
BE | 31.12.2022 | ||
NO | 14.03.2023 | ||
GR | 15.03.2023 | ||
IS | 14.04.2023 | ||
PT | 14.04.2023 | ||
Former [2024/29] | AL | 14.12.2022 | |
AT | 14.12.2022 | ||
CY | 14.12.2022 | ||
CZ | 14.12.2022 | ||
DK | 14.12.2022 | ||
EE | 14.12.2022 | ||
ES | 14.12.2022 | ||
FI | 14.12.2022 | ||
HR | 14.12.2022 | ||
LT | 14.12.2022 | ||
LV | 14.12.2022 | ||
MC | 14.12.2022 | ||
MK | 14.12.2022 | ||
NL | 14.12.2022 | ||
PL | 14.12.2022 | ||
RO | 14.12.2022 | ||
RS | 14.12.2022 | ||
SE | 14.12.2022 | ||
SI | 14.12.2022 | ||
SK | 14.12.2022 | ||
SM | 14.12.2022 | ||
TR | 14.12.2022 | ||
LU | 28.12.2022 | ||
BE | 31.12.2022 | ||
NO | 14.03.2023 | ||
GR | 15.03.2023 | ||
IS | 14.04.2023 | ||
PT | 14.04.2023 | ||
Former [2024/27] | AL | 14.12.2022 | |
AT | 14.12.2022 | ||
CY | 14.12.2022 | ||
CZ | 14.12.2022 | ||
DK | 14.12.2022 | ||
EE | 14.12.2022 | ||
ES | 14.12.2022 | ||
FI | 14.12.2022 | ||
HR | 14.12.2022 | ||
LT | 14.12.2022 | ||
LV | 14.12.2022 | ||
MC | 14.12.2022 | ||
MK | 14.12.2022 | ||
NL | 14.12.2022 | ||
PL | 14.12.2022 | ||
RO | 14.12.2022 | ||
RS | 14.12.2022 | ||
SE | 14.12.2022 | ||
SI | 14.12.2022 | ||
SK | 14.12.2022 | ||
SM | 14.12.2022 | ||
LU | 28.12.2022 | ||
BE | 31.12.2022 | ||
NO | 14.03.2023 | ||
GR | 15.03.2023 | ||
IS | 14.04.2023 | ||
PT | 14.04.2023 | ||
Former [2024/21] | AL | 14.12.2022 | |
AT | 14.12.2022 | ||
CY | 14.12.2022 | ||
CZ | 14.12.2022 | ||
DK | 14.12.2022 | ||
EE | 14.12.2022 | ||
ES | 14.12.2022 | ||
FI | 14.12.2022 | ||
HR | 14.12.2022 | ||
LT | 14.12.2022 | ||
LV | 14.12.2022 | ||
MC | 14.12.2022 | ||
NL | 14.12.2022 | ||
PL | 14.12.2022 | ||
RO | 14.12.2022 | ||
RS | 14.12.2022 | ||
SE | 14.12.2022 | ||
SI | 14.12.2022 | ||
SK | 14.12.2022 | ||
SM | 14.12.2022 | ||
LU | 28.12.2022 | ||
BE | 31.12.2022 | ||
NO | 14.03.2023 | ||
GR | 15.03.2023 | ||
IS | 14.04.2023 | ||
PT | 14.04.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AL | 14.12.2022 | |
AT | 14.12.2022 | ||
CZ | 14.12.2022 | ||
DK | 14.12.2022 | ||
EE | 14.12.2022 | ||
ES | 14.12.2022 | ||
FI | 14.12.2022 | ||
HR | 14.12.2022 | ||
LT | 14.12.2022 | ||
LV | 14.12.2022 | ||
MC | 14.12.2022 | ||
NL | 14.12.2022 | ||
PL | 14.12.2022 | ||
RO | 14.12.2022 | ||
RS | 14.12.2022 | ||
SE | 14.12.2022 | ||
SI | 14.12.2022 | ||
SK | 14.12.2022 | ||
SM | 14.12.2022 | ||
LU | 28.12.2022 | ||
BE | 31.12.2022 | ||
NO | 14.03.2023 | ||
GR | 15.03.2023 | ||
IS | 14.04.2023 | ||
PT | 14.04.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | AL | 14.12.2022 | |
AT | 14.12.2022 | ||
CZ | 14.12.2022 | ||
DK | 14.12.2022 | ||
EE | 14.12.2022 | ||
ES | 14.12.2022 | ||
FI | 14.12.2022 | ||
HR | 14.12.2022 | ||
LT | 14.12.2022 | ||
LV | 14.12.2022 | ||
MC | 14.12.2022 | ||
NL | 14.12.2022 | ||
PL | 14.12.2022 | ||
RO | 14.12.2022 | ||
RS | 14.12.2022 | ||
SE | 14.12.2022 | ||
SI | 14.12.2022 | ||
SK | 14.12.2022 | ||
SM | 14.12.2022 | ||
IT | 28.12.2022 | ||
LU | 28.12.2022 | ||
BE | 31.12.2022 | ||
NO | 14.03.2023 | ||
GR | 15.03.2023 | ||
IS | 14.04.2023 | ||
PT | 14.04.2023 | ||
Former [2023/49] | AL | 14.12.2022 | |
AT | 14.12.2022 | ||
CZ | 14.12.2022 | ||
DK | 14.12.2022 | ||
EE | 14.12.2022 | ||
ES | 14.12.2022 | ||
FI | 14.12.2022 | ||
HR | 14.12.2022 | ||
LT | 14.12.2022 | ||
LV | 14.12.2022 | ||
MC | 14.12.2022 | ||
NL | 14.12.2022 | ||
PL | 14.12.2022 | ||
RO | 14.12.2022 | ||
RS | 14.12.2022 | ||
SE | 14.12.2022 | ||
SK | 14.12.2022 | ||
SM | 14.12.2022 | ||
IT | 28.12.2022 | ||
LU | 28.12.2022 | ||
BE | 31.12.2022 | ||
NO | 14.03.2023 | ||
GR | 15.03.2023 | ||
IS | 14.04.2023 | ||
PT | 14.04.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | AL | 14.12.2022 | |
AT | 14.12.2022 | ||
CZ | 14.12.2022 | ||
DK | 14.12.2022 | ||
EE | 14.12.2022 | ||
ES | 14.12.2022 | ||
FI | 14.12.2022 | ||
HR | 14.12.2022 | ||
LT | 14.12.2022 | ||
LV | 14.12.2022 | ||
MC | 14.12.2022 | ||
NL | 14.12.2022 | ||
PL | 14.12.2022 | ||
RO | 14.12.2022 | ||
RS | 14.12.2022 | ||
SE | 14.12.2022 | ||
SK | 14.12.2022 | ||
SM | 14.12.2022 | ||
IT | 28.12.2022 | ||
LU | 28.12.2022 | ||
NO | 14.03.2023 | ||
GR | 15.03.2023 | ||
IS | 14.04.2023 | ||
PT | 14.04.2023 | ||
Former [2023/44] | AL | 14.12.2022 | |
AT | 14.12.2022 | ||
CZ | 14.12.2022 | ||
EE | 14.12.2022 | ||
ES | 14.12.2022 | ||
FI | 14.12.2022 | ||
HR | 14.12.2022 | ||
LT | 14.12.2022 | ||
LV | 14.12.2022 | ||
MC | 14.12.2022 | ||
NL | 14.12.2022 | ||
PL | 14.12.2022 | ||
RO | 14.12.2022 | ||
RS | 14.12.2022 | ||
SE | 14.12.2022 | ||
SK | 14.12.2022 | ||
SM | 14.12.2022 | ||
IT | 28.12.2022 | ||
LU | 28.12.2022 | ||
NO | 14.03.2023 | ||
GR | 15.03.2023 | ||
IS | 14.04.2023 | ||
PT | 14.04.2023 | ||
Former [2023/39] | AL | 14.12.2022 | |
AT | 14.12.2022 | ||
CZ | 14.12.2022 | ||
EE | 14.12.2022 | ||
ES | 14.12.2022 | ||
FI | 14.12.2022 | ||
HR | 14.12.2022 | ||
LT | 14.12.2022 | ||
LV | 14.12.2022 | ||
NL | 14.12.2022 | ||
PL | 14.12.2022 | ||
RO | 14.12.2022 | ||
RS | 14.12.2022 | ||
SE | 14.12.2022 | ||
SK | 14.12.2022 | ||
SM | 14.12.2022 | ||
IT | 28.12.2022 | ||
LU | 28.12.2022 | ||
NO | 14.03.2023 | ||
GR | 15.03.2023 | ||
IS | 14.04.2023 | ||
PT | 14.04.2023 | ||
Former [2023/38] | AL | 14.12.2022 | |
AT | 14.12.2022 | ||
CZ | 14.12.2022 | ||
EE | 14.12.2022 | ||
ES | 14.12.2022 | ||
FI | 14.12.2022 | ||
HR | 14.12.2022 | ||
LT | 14.12.2022 | ||
LV | 14.12.2022 | ||
NL | 14.12.2022 | ||
PL | 14.12.2022 | ||
RO | 14.12.2022 | ||
RS | 14.12.2022 | ||
SE | 14.12.2022 | ||
SK | 14.12.2022 | ||
SM | 14.12.2022 | ||
IT | 28.12.2022 | ||
LU | 28.12.2022 | ||
NO | 14.03.2023 | ||
GR | 15.03.2023 | ||
PT | 14.04.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AL | 14.12.2022 | |
AT | 14.12.2022 | ||
CZ | 14.12.2022 | ||
EE | 14.12.2022 | ||
ES | 14.12.2022 | ||
FI | 14.12.2022 | ||
HR | 14.12.2022 | ||
LT | 14.12.2022 | ||
LV | 14.12.2022 | ||
NL | 14.12.2022 | ||
RO | 14.12.2022 | ||
RS | 14.12.2022 | ||
SE | 14.12.2022 | ||
SM | 14.12.2022 | ||
IT | 28.12.2022 | ||
NO | 14.03.2023 | ||
GR | 15.03.2023 | ||
PT | 14.04.2023 | ||
Former [2023/35] | AT | 14.12.2022 | |
CZ | 14.12.2022 | ||
EE | 14.12.2022 | ||
ES | 14.12.2022 | ||
FI | 14.12.2022 | ||
HR | 14.12.2022 | ||
LT | 14.12.2022 | ||
LV | 14.12.2022 | ||
NL | 14.12.2022 | ||
RO | 14.12.2022 | ||
RS | 14.12.2022 | ||
SE | 14.12.2022 | ||
SM | 14.12.2022 | ||
IT | 28.12.2022 | ||
NO | 14.03.2023 | ||
GR | 15.03.2023 | ||
PT | 14.04.2023 | ||
Former [2023/34] | EE | 14.12.2022 | |
ES | 14.12.2022 | ||
FI | 14.12.2022 | ||
HR | 14.12.2022 | ||
LT | 14.12.2022 | ||
LV | 14.12.2022 | ||
NL | 14.12.2022 | ||
RS | 14.12.2022 | ||
SE | 14.12.2022 | ||
SM | 14.12.2022 | ||
NO | 14.03.2023 | ||
GR | 15.03.2023 | ||
PT | 14.04.2023 | ||
Former [2023/33] | ES | 14.12.2022 | |
FI | 14.12.2022 | ||
HR | 14.12.2022 | ||
LT | 14.12.2022 | ||
LV | 14.12.2022 | ||
NL | 14.12.2022 | ||
RS | 14.12.2022 | ||
SE | 14.12.2022 | ||
SM | 14.12.2022 | ||
NO | 14.03.2023 | ||
GR | 15.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/29] | FI | 14.12.2022 | |
HR | 14.12.2022 | ||
LT | 14.12.2022 | ||
LV | 14.12.2022 | ||
NL | 14.12.2022 | ||
RS | 14.12.2022 | ||
SE | 14.12.2022 | ||
NO | 14.03.2023 | ||
GR | 15.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/25] | FI | 14.12.2022 | |
HR | 14.12.2022 | ||
LT | 14.12.2022 | ||
LV | 14.12.2022 | ||
RS | 14.12.2022 | ||
SE | 14.12.2022 | ||
NO | 14.03.2023 | ||
GR | 15.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/23] | FI | 14.12.2022 | |
LT | 14.12.2022 | ||
LV | 14.12.2022 | ||
SE | 14.12.2022 | ||
NO | 14.03.2023 | ||
GR | 15.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/22] | FI | 14.12.2022 | |
LT | 14.12.2022 | ||
SE | 14.12.2022 | ||
NO | 14.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/20] | LT | 14.12.2022 | |
NO | 14.03.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]WO9808567 (PACESETTER AB [SE], et al) [Y] 1,5,6 * abstract * * page 5, line 8 - page 9, line 25 * [A] 2-4,7-13; | [A]EP2857065 (SORIN CRM SAS [FR]) [A] 1-13 * abstract ** paragraphs [0029] - [0091] *; | [A]US2019091479 (BONNET JEAN-LUC [FR]) [A] 1-13 * abstract * * paragraphs [0055] - [0112] *; | [A]EP3693056 (CAIRDAC [FR]) [A] 1-13 * abstract * * paragraphs [0039] - [0085] *; | [YA]EP3708221 (CAIRDAC [FR]) [Y] 1,5,6 * abstract * * paragraphs [0037] - [0092] * [A] 2-4,7-13 | by applicant | US3456134 | US2009171408 | US2017151429 | WO2018122244 | WO2019001829 | US2019070422 | EP3730185 | EP20200315501 |