blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP3854387

EP3854387 - NEW TETRAPEPTIDES AND FUNCTIONALISED MICROCAPSULES AS SKIN PENETRATION CARRIERS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  03.06.2022
Database last updated on 09.05.2025
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  25.06.2021
Most recent event   Tooltip03.06.2022Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 06.07.2022  [2022/27]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Infinitec Activos S.L.
Can Parellada, 22, Nave 2-3
08170 Montornés del Vallès, Barcelona / ES
[2021/30]
Inventor(s)01 / VASCONCELOS PACHECO, Aimee
INFINITEC ACTIVOS, S.L.
Can Parellada, 22, Nave 2-3
E-08170 Montornés del Vallès - Barcelona / ES
02 / GALATOLA, Ramona
INFINITEC ACTIVOS, S.L.
Can Parellada, 22, Nave 2-3
E-08170 Montornés del Vallès - Barcelona / ES
03 / MOURELLE MANCINI, Marisabel
INFINITEC ACTIVOS, S.L.
Can Parellada, 22, Nave 2-3
E-08170 Montornés del Vallès - Barcelona / ES
 [2021/30]
Representative(s)ABG Intellectual Property Law, S.L.
Avenida de Burgos, 16D
Edificio Euromor
28036 Madrid / ES
[2021/30]
Application number, filing date20382036.023.01.2020
[2021/30]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3854387
Date:28.07.2021
Language:EN
[2021/30]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP31.07.2020
ClassificationIPC:A61K9/50, A61K8/11, A61K8/64, A61Q19/00
[2021/30]
CPC:
A61K9/5031 (EP); A61K8/11 (EP,US); A61K8/498 (US);
A61K8/64 (EP,US); A61K8/85 (US); A61Q19/00 (EP,US);
A61K2800/10 (EP) (-)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2021/30]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesKHNot yet paid
MANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TNNot yet paid
TitleGerman:NEUE TETRAPEPTIDE UND FUNKTIONALISIERTE MIKROKAPSELN ALS HAUTPENETRATIONSTRÄGER[2021/30]
English:NEW TETRAPEPTIDES AND FUNCTIONALISED MICROCAPSULES AS SKIN PENETRATION CARRIERS[2021/30]
French:NOUVEAUX TÉTRAPEPTIDES ET MICROCAPSULES FONCTIONNALISÉES EN TANT QUE SUPPORTS DE PÉNÉTRATION CUTANÉE[2021/30]
Examination procedure29.01.2022Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2022/27]
18.02.2022Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2022/27]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.01.202203   M06   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]US9333163  (FAROKHZAD OMID C [US], et al) [A] 1-15* the whole document *;
 [ID]WO2016135203  (INFINITEC ACTIVOS S L [ES]) [ID] 1-15 * seqID No.6; page 3, line 3 - line 31; claims 1-11 * * page 6, line 10 - page 7, line 3 * * page 7, line 26 - page 9, line 9 *;
 [A]US2016250128  (MOURELLE MANCINI MARISABEL [ES], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0015] - [0024] - [0040] , [0041] , [0071] - [0080] *;
 [A]WO2017210666  (STEMGENICS INC [US]) [A] 1-15 * claims 45-61 *
by applicantWO2016135203
    - Eur. J. Biochem., (19840000), vol. 138, page 937
    - BERGE S.M.BIGHLEY L.D.MONKHOUSE D.C., "Pharmaceutical Salts", J. Pharm. Sci., (19770000), vol. 66, doi:10.1002/jps.2600660104, pages 1 - 19, XP002675560

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/jps.2600660104
    - E.W. MARTIN, Remington's Pharmaceutical Sciences
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.