EP3882240 - COCRYSTALS OF (1R,3S)-3-(5-CYANO-4-PHENYL-1,3-THIAZOL-2-YLCABAMOYL)CYCLOPENTANE CARBOXYLIC ACID [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.08.2022 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 20.08.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.08.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.09.2022 [2022/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Palobiofarma, S.L. Tecnocampus Mataró, 3 Avenida Ernest Lluch, 32 Planta 4, oficina 1 08302 Mataró-Barcelona / ES | [2021/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PALOMINO LARIA, Julio Castro Tecnocampus Mataró, 3 Avenida Ernest Lluch, 32 Planta 4, oficina 01 08302 Mataró, Barcelona / ES | 02 /
CAMACHO GÓMEZ, Juan Tecnocampus Mataró, 3 Avenida Ernest Lluch, 32 Planta 4, oficina 1 08302 Mataró, Barcelona / ES | [2021/38] | Representative(s) | ABG Intellectual Property Law, S.L. Avenida de Burgos, 16D Edificio Euromor 28036 Madrid / ES | [2021/38] | Application number, filing date | 20382194.7 | 16.03.2020 | [2021/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3882240 | Date: | 22.09.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.08.2020 | Classification | IPC: | C07D277/56, A61K31/426, A61P9/12, C07D213/82 | [2021/38] | CPC: |
C07D277/56 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/426 (KR);
A61K45/06 (US);
C07C275/02 (US);
C07C65/05 (US);
C07D213/82 (EP,US);
C07B2200/13 (KR,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/38] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | COKRISTALLE VON (1R,3S)-3-(5-CYANO-4-PHENYL-1,3-THIAZOL-2-YLCABAMOYL)CYCLOPENTANCARBONSÄURE | [2021/38] | English: | COCRYSTALS OF (1R,3S)-3-(5-CYANO-4-PHENYL-1,3-THIAZOL-2-YLCABAMOYL)CYCLOPENTANE CARBOXYLIC ACID | [2021/38] | French: | CO-CRISTAUX DE (1R, 3S)-3-(5-CYANO-4-PHENYL-1,3-THIAZOL-2-YLCABAMOYL)CYCLOPENTANE ACIDE CARBOXYLIQUE | [2021/38] | Examination procedure | 23.03.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2022/38] | 19.04.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2022/38] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2022 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]WO2018162505 (PALOBIOFARMA SL [ES]) | by applicant | WO2009044250 |