Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP3881936
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
30.08.2024 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
01.05.2024 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
13.03.2024 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
07.02.2024 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
01.12.2023 |
Change - inventor |
published on 03.01.2024 [2024/01] |
27.11.2023 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
28.07.2023 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
13.06.2023 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
22.03.2023 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
22.03.2023 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
02.12.2022 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
02.12.2022 |
First examination report |
|
25.03.2022 |
The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established |
|
25.03.2022 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
25.03.2022 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 27.04.2022 [2022/17] |
25.03.2022 |
Change - designated states |
published on 27.04.2022 [2022/17] |
24.03.2022 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
20.08.2021 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 22.09.2021 [2021/38] |
01.04.2020 |
Change - representative |
|