EP3881936 - MULTICOMPONENT SPRAY GUN AND SPRAY EQUIPMENT INCLUDING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.12.2022 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.03.2022 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 20.08.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.2024 | Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hi-Tech Spray Equipment, S.A. Av. Camí Pla, 31 - Polígono Industrial Mas Alba 08870 Sitges / ES | [2021/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RASET PAPIOL, Josep Maria Av. Camí Pla, 31 - Polígono Industrial Mas Alba 08870 Sitges / ES | [2024/01] |
Former [2021/38] | 01 /
RASET PAPIOL, Josep Maria Av. Camí Pla, 31 - Polígono Industrial Mas Alba 08870 SITGES / ES | Representative(s) | Ponti & Partners, S.L.P Edifici PRISMA Av. Diagonal núm. 611-613, Planta 2 08028 Barcelona / ES | [N/P] |
Former [2021/38] | Ponti & Partners, S.L.P C. de Consell de Cent 322 08007 Barcelona / ES | Application number, filing date | 20382196.2 | 16.03.2020 | [2021/38] | Filing language | ES | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3881936 | Date: | 22.09.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.07.2020 | Classification | IPC: | B05B7/00 | [2021/38] | CPC: |
B05B7/0408 (EP,US);
B05B7/12 (US);
B05B7/2497 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/17] |
Former [2021/38] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MEHRKOMPONENTENSPRITZPISTOLE UND SPRITZAUSRÜSTUNG DAMIT | [2021/38] | English: | MULTICOMPONENT SPRAY GUN AND SPRAY EQUIPMENT INCLUDING SAME | [2021/38] | French: | PISTOLET DE PULVÉRISATION À PLUSIEURS COMPOSANTS ET ÉQUIPEMENT DE PULVÉRISATION LE COMPRENANT | [2021/38] | Examination procedure | 22.03.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.03.2022 | Examination requested [2022/17] | 22.03.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 01.12.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.06.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.07.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.02.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.04.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]WO2004037429 (GRACO MINNESOTA INC [US], et al); | [XY]US8931715 (COURIER JOHN P [US]) |