EP3909663 - CARTRIDGE ASSEMBLY, REPLACEABLE FILTER CAPSULE, AND FILTER SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.12.2023 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 06.04.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.05.2022 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 15.10.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.12.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.01.2024 [2024/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tapp Water S.L. Carrer de Blesa 27 08004 Barcelona / ES | [2021/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JERN, Magnus 08004 Barcelona / ES | 02 /
SCHWARZ, Alexander 08004 Barcelona / ES | 03 /
TROYANO, Marina 08004 Barcelona / ES | 04 /
BENDER, Nicholas 08004 Barcelona / ES | [2021/46] | Representative(s) | Mohammadian, Dario KUKATI Apartado de Correos 34031 08080 Barcelona / ES | [2021/46] | Application number, filing date | 20382412.3 | 15.05.2020 | [2021/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3909663 | Date: | 17.11.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.10.2020 | Classification | IPC: | B01D35/04, // C02F5/14, B01D29/33 | [2021/46] | CPC: |
B01D35/04 (EP);
C02F1/003 (EP);
B01D2201/308 (EP);
B01D29/33 (EP);
C02F1/283 (EP);
C02F1/68 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/26] |
Former [2021/46] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PATRONENANORDNUNG, AUSTAUSCHBARE FILTERKAPSEL UND FILTERSYSTEM | [2021/46] | English: | CARTRIDGE ASSEMBLY, REPLACEABLE FILTER CAPSULE, AND FILTER SYSTEM | [2021/46] | French: | ENSEMBLE DE CARTOUCHE, FILTRE REMPLAÇABLE, CAPSULE ET SYSTÈME DE FILTRE | [2021/46] | Examination procedure | 16.05.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.05.2022 | Examination requested [2022/26] | 17.05.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 05.04.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.08.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2024/03] | 06.09.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2024/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2023 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5411661 (HEILIGMAN RANDY B [US]) [A] 1-15 * figures 1-7 ** column 3, line 4 - column 5, line 38 *; | [Y]US2005051494 (NA HENRY CHENG [US], et al) [Y] 14 * figures 1-10 * * paragraphs [0054] - [0070] *; | [X]US2009014382 (KWAN DAVID C [US], et al) [X] 1-8,10,11 * figures 1-9 * * paragraphs [0022] - [0052] *; | [XY]US2015068987 (BASSETT LAURENCE W [US], et al) [X] 1-9,11-13,15 * figures 1-4 * * paragraphs [0051] - [0058] * [Y] 14 |