EP3919161 - SCRUBBER APPARATUS FOR CARBON DIOXIDE REMOVAL BY TEMPERATURE SWING ADSORPTION AND CONTROLLED ATMOSPHERE OPERATING METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 11.07.2024 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.08.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.06.2022 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 05.11.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.07.2024 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Thermo King LLC 314 West 90th Street Minneapolis, MN 55420 / US | [2023/18] |
Former [2021/49] | For all designated states Thermo King Corporation 314 West 90th Street Minneapolis, MN 55420 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STAVOVA, Petra 26601 Beroun / CZ | 02 /
VOJIK, Martin 14300 Praha / CZ | 03 /
FERRER BLAS, Miguel Angel 08980 Barcelona / ES | 04 /
KOHOUTEK, Tomá 273 51 Cerveny Ujezd / CZ | 05 /
KOLDA, Michal 15000 Prague / CZ | [2021/49] | Representative(s) | Haseltine Lake Kempner LLP One Portwall Square Portwall Lane Bristol BS1 6BH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2021/49] | Haseltine Lake Kempner LLP Redcliff Quay 120 Redcliff Street Bristol BS1 6HU / GB | Application number, filing date | 20382472.7 | 02.06.2020 | [2021/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3919161 | Date: | 08.12.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.11.2020 | Classification | IPC: | B01D53/04, A23B7/148 | [2021/49] | CPC: |
B01D53/0462 (EP);
B01D53/10 (CN);
B01D53/0438 (US);
B01D53/0446 (US);
B01D53/0454 (US);
A23B7/04 (EP);
A23B7/148 (EP);
B01D2253/102 (EP,US);
B01D2257/504 (EP,CN,US);
B01D2259/40007 (EP);
B01D2259/40086 (US);
B01D2259/40088 (EP);
B01D2259/40096 (US);
B01D2259/401 (EP);
B01D2259/4525 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/28] |
Former [2021/49] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR ENTFERNUNG VON KOHLENDIOXID DURCH TEMPERATURWECHSELADSORPTION UND BETRIEBSVERFAHREN MIT KONTROLLIERTER ATMOSPHÄRE | [2021/49] | English: | SCRUBBER APPARATUS FOR CARBON DIOXIDE REMOVAL BY TEMPERATURE SWING ADSORPTION AND CONTROLLED ATMOSPHERE OPERATING METHOD | [2021/49] | French: | DISPOSITIF POUR L'ÉLIMINATION DE DIOXYDE DE CARBONE PAR ADSORPTION À MODULATION DE TEMPÉRATURE ET PROCÉDÉ DE FONCTIONNEMENT À ATMOSPHÈRE CONTRÔLÉE | [2021/49] | Examination procedure | 08.06.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.06.2022 | Examination requested [2022/28] | 08.06.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 02.08.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.10.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.07.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.06.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2010242728 (RADOSZ MACIEJ [US], et al); | [Y]WO2013012623 (CARRIER CORP [US], et al); | [A]US2014186255 (JADHAV RAJA A [US]); | [XYI]WO2016108952 (THERMO KING CORP [US]); | [A]WO2019092128 (CLIMEWORKS AG [CH]) |