EP3933012 - METHODS FOR REDUCING FORMATION OF CARBON DISULFIDE IN STEAM CRACKING PROCESSES TO PRODUCE OLEFINS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.07.2022 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 03.12.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.05.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dow Global Technologies LLC 2211 H.H. Dow Way Midland, MI 48674 / US | [2022/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wang, Hangyao Freeport, Texas 77541 / US | 02 /
Pazmino, Jorge H. Freeport, Texas 77541 / US | 03 /
LIU, Yu Freeport, Texas 77541 / US | 04 /
Bellos, Georgios 4542 NM Hoek / NL | [2022/01] | Representative(s) | Yazitzoglou, Evagelia S. Dr. Helen G. Papaconstantinou and Partners 2, Coumbari Street Kolonaki 106 74 Athens / GR | [2022/01] | Application number, filing date | 20386034.1 | 29.06.2020 | [2022/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3933012 | Date: | 05.01.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.11.2020 | Classification | IPC: | C10G9/36, C10G45/32, C10G45/02, C10G75/04 | [2022/01] | CPC: |
C10G9/36 (EP,US);
C07C4/04 (US);
C07C5/09 (US);
C07C7/14858 (US);
C07C7/14875 (US);
C10G45/02 (EP);
C10G45/32 (EP);
C10G69/06 (US);
C10G75/02 (US);
C10G75/04 (EP);
C10G2300/202 (EP,US);
C10G2300/207 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/32] |
Former [2022/01] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR VERRINGERUNG DER BILDUNG VON SCHWEFELKOHLENSTOFF IN DAMPFCRACKVERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON OLEFINEN | [2022/01] | English: | METHODS FOR REDUCING FORMATION OF CARBON DISULFIDE IN STEAM CRACKING PROCESSES TO PRODUCE OLEFINS | [2022/01] | French: | PROCÉDÉS DE RÉDUCTION DE FORMATION DE DISULFURE DE CARBONE DANS DES PROCESSUS DE CRAQUAGE À LA VAPEUR POUR PRODUIRE DES OLÉFINES | [2022/01] | Examination procedure | 01.07.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.07.2022 | Examination requested [2022/32] | 01.07.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.05.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US6514631 (YAMAMOTO KATSUMI [JP], et al) [X] 1-15 * column 8, line 45 * * column 8, line 61 * * column 8, line 3 - column 9, line 17; figure 3 *; | [A]US2012203039 (SMITH JR LAWRENCE A [US]) [A] 1-15* paragraphs [0018] - [0031]; figure 1 *; | [X]NL2024522 (NESTE OYJ [FI]) [X] 1-15 * page 26, lines 21-22 * * page 26, line 22 - page 27, line 8 * * page 25, line 3 * * page 29, lines 10-21 * * page 43, line 21 - page 59, line 1; tables 2-12 * |