EP3982087 - AN ELECTRICITY METERING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.08.2023 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 02.09.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 24.05.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.03.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.07.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG | published on 21.08.2024 [2024/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Aidon Oy Piippukatu 11 40100 Jyväskylä / FI | [2022/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LOHVANSUU, Juha 40720 Jyväskylä / FI | [2022/15] | Representative(s) | Berggren Oy P.O. Box 16 Eteläinen Rautatiekatu 10A 00101 Helsinki / FI | [2022/15] | Application number, filing date | 20397513.1 | 09.10.2020 | [2022/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3982087 | Date: | 13.04.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3982087 | Date: | 05.10.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.02.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G01D4/00, G01R22/06, G01D21/00 | [2022/15] | CPC: |
G01D4/002 (EP);
G01D21/00 (EP);
G01R22/063 (EP);
G01D2204/22 (EP);
Y02B70/30 (EP);
Y04S20/242 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/15] | Title | German: | STROMMESSVORRICHTUNG | [2022/15] | English: | AN ELECTRICITY METERING DEVICE | [2022/15] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE MESURE D'ÉLECTRICITÉ | [2022/15] | Examination procedure | 08.03.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.04.2021 | Examination requested [2022/15] | 08.04.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 25.05.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.08.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 23.08.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 23.08.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 06.07.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/37] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 09.10.2020 | AL | 05.10.2022 | BG | 05.10.2022 | CY | 05.10.2022 | CZ | 05.10.2022 | EE | 05.10.2022 | ES | 05.10.2022 | HR | 05.10.2022 | IT | 05.10.2022 | LT | 05.10.2022 | LV | 05.10.2022 | MC | 05.10.2022 | MK | 05.10.2022 | PL | 05.10.2022 | RO | 05.10.2022 | RS | 05.10.2022 | SI | 05.10.2022 | SK | 05.10.2022 | SM | 05.10.2022 | TR | 05.10.2022 | IE | 09.10.2022 | LU | 09.10.2022 | GR | 06.01.2023 | IS | 05.02.2023 | PT | 06.02.2023 | [2024/34] |
Former [2024/32] | HU | 09.10.2020 | |
AL | 05.10.2022 | ||
CY | 05.10.2022 | ||
CZ | 05.10.2022 | ||
EE | 05.10.2022 | ||
ES | 05.10.2022 | ||
HR | 05.10.2022 | ||
IT | 05.10.2022 | ||
LT | 05.10.2022 | ||
LV | 05.10.2022 | ||
MC | 05.10.2022 | ||
MK | 05.10.2022 | ||
PL | 05.10.2022 | ||
RO | 05.10.2022 | ||
RS | 05.10.2022 | ||
SI | 05.10.2022 | ||
SK | 05.10.2022 | ||
SM | 05.10.2022 | ||
TR | 05.10.2022 | ||
IE | 09.10.2022 | ||
LU | 09.10.2022 | ||
GR | 06.01.2023 | ||
IS | 05.02.2023 | ||
PT | 06.02.2023 | ||
Former [2024/29] | AL | 05.10.2022 | |
CY | 05.10.2022 | ||
CZ | 05.10.2022 | ||
EE | 05.10.2022 | ||
ES | 05.10.2022 | ||
HR | 05.10.2022 | ||
IT | 05.10.2022 | ||
LT | 05.10.2022 | ||
LV | 05.10.2022 | ||
MC | 05.10.2022 | ||
MK | 05.10.2022 | ||
PL | 05.10.2022 | ||
RO | 05.10.2022 | ||
RS | 05.10.2022 | ||
SI | 05.10.2022 | ||
SK | 05.10.2022 | ||
SM | 05.10.2022 | ||
TR | 05.10.2022 | ||
IE | 09.10.2022 | ||
LU | 09.10.2022 | ||
GR | 06.01.2023 | ||
IS | 05.02.2023 | ||
PT | 06.02.2023 | ||
Former [2024/27] | AL | 05.10.2022 | |
CY | 05.10.2022 | ||
CZ | 05.10.2022 | ||
EE | 05.10.2022 | ||
ES | 05.10.2022 | ||
HR | 05.10.2022 | ||
IT | 05.10.2022 | ||
LT | 05.10.2022 | ||
LV | 05.10.2022 | ||
MC | 05.10.2022 | ||
MK | 05.10.2022 | ||
PL | 05.10.2022 | ||
RO | 05.10.2022 | ||
RS | 05.10.2022 | ||
SI | 05.10.2022 | ||
SK | 05.10.2022 | ||
SM | 05.10.2022 | ||
IE | 09.10.2022 | ||
LU | 09.10.2022 | ||
GR | 06.01.2023 | ||
IS | 05.02.2023 | ||
PT | 06.02.2023 | ||
Former [2024/26] | AL | 05.10.2022 | |
CY | 05.10.2022 | ||
CZ | 05.10.2022 | ||
EE | 05.10.2022 | ||
ES | 05.10.2022 | ||
HR | 05.10.2022 | ||
IT | 05.10.2022 | ||
LT | 05.10.2022 | ||
LV | 05.10.2022 | ||
MC | 05.10.2022 | ||
PL | 05.10.2022 | ||
RO | 05.10.2022 | ||
RS | 05.10.2022 | ||
SI | 05.10.2022 | ||
SK | 05.10.2022 | ||
SM | 05.10.2022 | ||
IE | 09.10.2022 | ||
LU | 09.10.2022 | ||
GR | 06.01.2023 | ||
IS | 05.02.2023 | ||
PT | 06.02.2023 | ||
Former [2024/21] | AL | 05.10.2022 | |
CY | 05.10.2022 | ||
CZ | 05.10.2022 | ||
EE | 05.10.2022 | ||
ES | 05.10.2022 | ||
HR | 05.10.2022 | ||
LT | 05.10.2022 | ||
LV | 05.10.2022 | ||
MC | 05.10.2022 | ||
PL | 05.10.2022 | ||
RO | 05.10.2022 | ||
RS | 05.10.2022 | ||
SI | 05.10.2022 | ||
SK | 05.10.2022 | ||
SM | 05.10.2022 | ||
IE | 09.10.2022 | ||
LU | 09.10.2022 | ||
GR | 06.01.2023 | ||
IS | 05.02.2023 | ||
PT | 06.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | AL | 05.10.2022 | |
CZ | 05.10.2022 | ||
EE | 05.10.2022 | ||
ES | 05.10.2022 | ||
HR | 05.10.2022 | ||
LT | 05.10.2022 | ||
LV | 05.10.2022 | ||
MC | 05.10.2022 | ||
PL | 05.10.2022 | ||
RO | 05.10.2022 | ||
RS | 05.10.2022 | ||
SI | 05.10.2022 | ||
SK | 05.10.2022 | ||
SM | 05.10.2022 | ||
IE | 09.10.2022 | ||
LU | 09.10.2022 | ||
GR | 06.01.2023 | ||
IS | 05.02.2023 | ||
PT | 06.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AL | 05.10.2022 | |
CZ | 05.10.2022 | ||
EE | 05.10.2022 | ||
ES | 05.10.2022 | ||
HR | 05.10.2022 | ||
LT | 05.10.2022 | ||
LV | 05.10.2022 | ||
MC | 05.10.2022 | ||
PL | 05.10.2022 | ||
RO | 05.10.2022 | ||
RS | 05.10.2022 | ||
SK | 05.10.2022 | ||
SM | 05.10.2022 | ||
IE | 09.10.2022 | ||
LU | 09.10.2022 | ||
GR | 06.01.2023 | ||
IS | 05.02.2023 | ||
PT | 06.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/38] | AL | 05.10.2022 | |
CZ | 05.10.2022 | ||
EE | 05.10.2022 | ||
ES | 05.10.2022 | ||
HR | 05.10.2022 | ||
LT | 05.10.2022 | ||
LV | 05.10.2022 | ||
MC | 05.10.2022 | ||
PL | 05.10.2022 | ||
RO | 05.10.2022 | ||
RS | 05.10.2022 | ||
SK | 05.10.2022 | ||
SM | 05.10.2022 | ||
LU | 09.10.2022 | ||
GR | 06.01.2023 | ||
IS | 05.02.2023 | ||
PT | 06.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AL | 05.10.2022 | |
CZ | 05.10.2022 | ||
EE | 05.10.2022 | ||
ES | 05.10.2022 | ||
HR | 05.10.2022 | ||
LT | 05.10.2022 | ||
LV | 05.10.2022 | ||
MC | 05.10.2022 | ||
PL | 05.10.2022 | ||
RO | 05.10.2022 | ||
RS | 05.10.2022 | ||
SM | 05.10.2022 | ||
LU | 09.10.2022 | ||
GR | 06.01.2023 | ||
IS | 05.02.2023 | ||
PT | 06.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/36] | CZ | 05.10.2022 | |
EE | 05.10.2022 | ||
ES | 05.10.2022 | ||
HR | 05.10.2022 | ||
LT | 05.10.2022 | ||
LV | 05.10.2022 | ||
MC | 05.10.2022 | ||
PL | 05.10.2022 | ||
RO | 05.10.2022 | ||
RS | 05.10.2022 | ||
SM | 05.10.2022 | ||
LU | 09.10.2022 | ||
GR | 06.01.2023 | ||
IS | 05.02.2023 | ||
PT | 06.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/35] | CZ | 05.10.2022 | |
EE | 05.10.2022 | ||
ES | 05.10.2022 | ||
HR | 05.10.2022 | ||
LT | 05.10.2022 | ||
LV | 05.10.2022 | ||
PL | 05.10.2022 | ||
RO | 05.10.2022 | ||
RS | 05.10.2022 | ||
SM | 05.10.2022 | ||
LU | 09.10.2022 | ||
GR | 06.01.2023 | ||
IS | 05.02.2023 | ||
PT | 06.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/34] | EE | 05.10.2022 | |
ES | 05.10.2022 | ||
HR | 05.10.2022 | ||
LT | 05.10.2022 | ||
LV | 05.10.2022 | ||
PL | 05.10.2022 | ||
RS | 05.10.2022 | ||
SM | 05.10.2022 | ||
LU | 09.10.2022 | ||
GR | 06.01.2023 | ||
IS | 05.02.2023 | ||
PT | 06.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/33] | ES | 05.10.2022 | |
HR | 05.10.2022 | ||
LT | 05.10.2022 | ||
LV | 05.10.2022 | ||
PL | 05.10.2022 | ||
RS | 05.10.2022 | ||
SM | 05.10.2022 | ||
LU | 09.10.2022 | ||
GR | 06.01.2023 | ||
IS | 05.02.2023 | ||
PT | 06.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/30] | ES | 05.10.2022 | |
HR | 05.10.2022 | ||
LT | 05.10.2022 | ||
LV | 05.10.2022 | ||
PL | 05.10.2022 | ||
RS | 05.10.2022 | ||
LU | 09.10.2022 | ||
GR | 06.01.2023 | ||
IS | 05.02.2023 | ||
PT | 06.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/25] | ES | 05.10.2022 | |
HR | 05.10.2022 | ||
LT | 05.10.2022 | ||
LV | 05.10.2022 | ||
PL | 05.10.2022 | ||
RS | 05.10.2022 | ||
GR | 06.01.2023 | ||
IS | 05.02.2023 | ||
PT | 06.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/23] | ES | 05.10.2022 | |
LT | 05.10.2022 | ||
LV | 05.10.2022 | ||
GR | 06.01.2023 | ||
PT | 06.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/22] | ES | 05.10.2022 | |
LT | 05.10.2022 | ||
PT | 06.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/20] | LT | 05.10.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2008266133 (MARTIN WARREN THOMAS [US]) [A] 1-15* paragraphs [0022] - [0023] - [0030] - [0043]; figures 2,3 *; | [A]EP2498060 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0019] - [0021] - [0 26] - [0034]; figures 2, 4 * |