EP3967326 - IMMUNOGENIC COMPOSITIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 30.09.2022 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 11.02.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.2022 | Refusal of application | published on 02.11.2022 [2022/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Immunethep, SA Biocant Park, Núcleo 4 Lote 3 3060-197 Cantanhede / PT | [2022/11] | Representative(s) | Cooley (UK) LLP 22 Bishopsgate London EC2N 4BQ / GB | [2022/11] | Application number, filing date | 20398008.1 | 10.09.2020 | [2022/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3967326 | Date: | 16.03.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.04.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A61K39/12, A61P31/14 | [2022/11] | CPC: |
A61K39/12 (EP);
A61P31/14 (EP);
A61K2039/5252 (EP);
A61K2039/5254 (EP);
A61K2039/543 (EP);
A61K2039/544 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/11] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | IMMUNOGENE ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN | [2022/11] | English: | IMMUNOGENIC COMPOSITIONS | [2022/11] | French: | COMPOSITIONS IMMUNOGÈNES | [2022/11] | Examination procedure | 13.06.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: Examination on filing A.90(5) [2022/44] | 23.06.2022 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2022/44] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY] - GAO QIANG ET AL, "Development of an inactivated vaccine candidate for SARS-CoV-2", SCIENCE, US, vol. 369, no. 6499, doi:10.1126/science.abc1932, ISSN 0036-8075, (20200703), pages 77 - 81, URL: https://science.sciencemag.org/content/sci/369/6499/77.full.pdf, (20210315), XP055785035 [X] 1,5-7,9,12 * the whole document * [Y] 2,3,8,10,11,14,15 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.abc1932 | [Y] - Anonymous, "Safety and Immunogenicity Study of Inactivated Vaccine for Prophylaxis of SARS CoV-2 Infection (COVID-19) - Full Text View - ClinicalTrials.gov", (20200420), URL: https://clinicaltrials.gov/ct2/show/study/NCT04352608, (20210312), XP055785333 [Y] 2,3,8,10,11,14,15 * the whole document * | [Y] - WANG HUI ET AL, "Development of an Inactivated Vaccine Candidate, BBIBP-CorV, with Potent Protection against SARS-CoV-2", CELL, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM NL, vol. 182, no. 3, doi:10.1016/J.CELL.2020.06.008, ISSN 0092-8674, (20200606), page 713, (20200606), XP086239951 [Y] 2,3,8,10,11,14,15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.cell.2020.06.008 | [Y] - Anonymous, "Codagenix Announces the Synthesis and Preliminary Safety of Scalable, Live-attenuated Vaccine Candidate Against COVID-19 - SynBioBeta", (20200618), URL: https://synbiobeta.com/codagenix-announces-the-synthesis-and-preliminary-safety-of-scalable-live-attenuated-vaccine-candidate-against-covid-19/, (20210315), XP055785558 [Y] 2,3,8,10,11,14,15 * the whole document * | [XP] - Codagenix ET AL, "Serum Institute of India Initiates Manufacturing of Codagenix's Intranasal Live-Attenuated COVID-19 Vaccine Candidate", (20200922), URL: https://www.prnewswire.com/news-releases/serum-institute-of-india-initiates-manufacturing-of-codagenixs-intranasal-live-attenuated-covid-19-vaccine-candidate-301135221.html, (20210315), XP055785595 [XP] 1-4,12-15 * the whole document * | [Y] - GAI WEI-WEI ET AL, "PIKA provides an adjuvant effect to induce strong mucosal and systemic humoral immunity against SARS-CoV", VIROLOGICA SINICA, SPRINGER, DE, vol. 26, no. 2, doi:10.1007/S12250-011-3183-Z, ISSN 1674-0769, (20110401), pages 81 - 94, (20110407), XP037068928 [Y] 2,3,8,10,11,14,15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s12250-011-3183-z | by applicant | - WANG, C. et al., J Med Virol, (20200000), vol. 92, pages 667 - 674 | - ZHOU, P. et al., Nature, (20200000), vol. 579, no. 7798, pages 270 - 273 | - "NCBI", Database accession no. NC 045512.2 | - YUSUF, H. et al., Hum Vacc Immunother, (20170000), vol. 13, no. 1, pages 34 - 45 | - OKADA, H. et al., J Clin Oncol, (20110000), vol. 29, no. 3, pages 330 - 336 | - NG, M.L. et al., J Gen Virol, (20030000), vol. 84, no. 12, pages 3291 - 3303 | - KEYAERTS, E. et al., Biochem Biophys Res Commun, (20050000), vol. 329, no. 3, pages 1147 - 1151 | - BERNSTEIN, D.I., Semin Pediatr Infect Dis, (20060000), vol. 17, no. 4, pages 188 - 194 |