EP3818985 - LACTOBACILLUS FERMENTUM PL9 AND ITS APPLICATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.11.2022 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 03.12.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 27.10.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.07.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 09.04.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 30.10.2024 [2024/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sanprobi Spólka Z Ograniczona Odpowiedzialnoscia Spólka Komandytowa ul. Kurza Stopka 5/C 70-535 Szczecin / PL | [2022/01] |
Former [2021/19] | For all designated states Sanprobi Spolka Z Ograniczona Odpowiedzialnoscia Spolka ul. Kurza Stopka 5/C 570-535 Szczecin / PL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Heczko, Piotr ul. Bema 11/1 31-517 Kraków / PL | 02 /
Strus, Magdalena ul. Wyzynna 20C 30-617 Kraków / PL | [2021/19] | Representative(s) | Magonska, Alina AMAG Kancelaria Patentowa Alina Magonska ul. Dobrego Pasterza 108/106 PL-31-416 Krakow / PL | [2021/19] | Application number, filing date | 20460040.7 | 21.10.2020 | [2021/19] | Priority number, date | PL20190431722 | 06.11.2019 Original published format: PL 43172219 | [2021/19] | Filing language | PL | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3818985 | Date: | 12.05.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3818985 | Date: | 05.01.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.03.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A61K35/747, A61P1/00, A61P1/04, A61P31/00, A61P31/04 | [2021/19] | CPC: |
A61K35/747 (EP,PL);
C12N1/20 (PL);
A61P1/00 (EP,PL);
A61P1/04 (EP);
A61P31/00 (EP);
A61P31/04 (EP,PL);
A61P31/10 (PL);
A61P31/12 (PL);
C12R2001/225 (PL);
Y02A50/30 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/34] |
Former [2021/19] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | LACTOBACILLUS FERMENTUM PL9 UND SEINER ANWENDUNG | [2021/19] | English: | LACTOBACILLUS FERMENTUM PL9 AND ITS APPLICATION | [2021/19] | French: | LACTOBACILLUS FERMENTUM PL9 ET SON APPLICATION | [2021/19] | Biological material | This application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details | Examination procedure | 12.07.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.07.2021 | Examination requested [2021/34] | 15.07.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 28.10.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.11.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 10.11.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 19.11.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 06.10.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/50] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 21.10.2020 | AL | 05.01.2022 | CY | 05.01.2022 | CZ | 05.01.2022 | DK | 05.01.2022 | EE | 05.01.2022 | ES | 05.01.2022 | FI | 05.01.2022 | HR | 05.01.2022 | LT | 05.01.2022 | LV | 05.01.2022 | MC | 05.01.2022 | MK | 05.01.2022 | MT | 05.01.2022 | PL | 05.01.2022 | RO | 05.01.2022 | RS | 05.01.2022 | SK | 05.01.2022 | SM | 05.01.2022 | TR | 05.01.2022 | BG | 05.04.2022 | NO | 05.04.2022 | GR | 06.04.2022 | IS | 05.05.2022 | PT | 05.05.2022 | [2024/44] |
Former [2024/32] | HU | 21.10.2020 | |
AL | 05.01.2022 | ||
CY | 05.01.2022 | ||
CZ | 05.01.2022 | ||
DK | 05.01.2022 | ||
EE | 05.01.2022 | ||
ES | 05.01.2022 | ||
FI | 05.01.2022 | ||
HR | 05.01.2022 | ||
LT | 05.01.2022 | ||
LV | 05.01.2022 | ||
MC | 05.01.2022 | ||
MK | 05.01.2022 | ||
PL | 05.01.2022 | ||
RO | 05.01.2022 | ||
RS | 05.01.2022 | ||
SK | 05.01.2022 | ||
SM | 05.01.2022 | ||
TR | 05.01.2022 | ||
BG | 05.04.2022 | ||
NO | 05.04.2022 | ||
GR | 06.04.2022 | ||
IS | 05.05.2022 | ||
PT | 05.05.2022 | ||
Former [2024/29] | AL | 05.01.2022 | |
CY | 05.01.2022 | ||
CZ | 05.01.2022 | ||
DK | 05.01.2022 | ||
EE | 05.01.2022 | ||
ES | 05.01.2022 | ||
FI | 05.01.2022 | ||
HR | 05.01.2022 | ||
LT | 05.01.2022 | ||
LV | 05.01.2022 | ||
MC | 05.01.2022 | ||
MK | 05.01.2022 | ||
PL | 05.01.2022 | ||
RO | 05.01.2022 | ||
RS | 05.01.2022 | ||
SK | 05.01.2022 | ||
SM | 05.01.2022 | ||
TR | 05.01.2022 | ||
BG | 05.04.2022 | ||
NO | 05.04.2022 | ||
GR | 06.04.2022 | ||
IS | 05.05.2022 | ||
PT | 05.05.2022 | ||
Former [2024/27] | AL | 05.01.2022 | |
CY | 05.01.2022 | ||
CZ | 05.01.2022 | ||
DK | 05.01.2022 | ||
EE | 05.01.2022 | ||
ES | 05.01.2022 | ||
FI | 05.01.2022 | ||
HR | 05.01.2022 | ||
LT | 05.01.2022 | ||
LV | 05.01.2022 | ||
MC | 05.01.2022 | ||
MK | 05.01.2022 | ||
PL | 05.01.2022 | ||
RO | 05.01.2022 | ||
RS | 05.01.2022 | ||
SK | 05.01.2022 | ||
SM | 05.01.2022 | ||
BG | 05.04.2022 | ||
NO | 05.04.2022 | ||
GR | 06.04.2022 | ||
IS | 05.05.2022 | ||
PT | 05.05.2022 | ||
Former [2024/21] | AL | 05.01.2022 | |
CY | 05.01.2022 | ||
CZ | 05.01.2022 | ||
DK | 05.01.2022 | ||
EE | 05.01.2022 | ||
ES | 05.01.2022 | ||
FI | 05.01.2022 | ||
HR | 05.01.2022 | ||
LT | 05.01.2022 | ||
LV | 05.01.2022 | ||
MC | 05.01.2022 | ||
PL | 05.01.2022 | ||
RO | 05.01.2022 | ||
RS | 05.01.2022 | ||
SK | 05.01.2022 | ||
SM | 05.01.2022 | ||
BG | 05.04.2022 | ||
NO | 05.04.2022 | ||
GR | 06.04.2022 | ||
IS | 05.05.2022 | ||
PT | 05.05.2022 | ||
Former [2023/25] | AL | 05.01.2022 | |
CZ | 05.01.2022 | ||
DK | 05.01.2022 | ||
EE | 05.01.2022 | ||
ES | 05.01.2022 | ||
FI | 05.01.2022 | ||
HR | 05.01.2022 | ||
LT | 05.01.2022 | ||
LV | 05.01.2022 | ||
MC | 05.01.2022 | ||
PL | 05.01.2022 | ||
RO | 05.01.2022 | ||
RS | 05.01.2022 | ||
SK | 05.01.2022 | ||
SM | 05.01.2022 | ||
BG | 05.04.2022 | ||
NO | 05.04.2022 | ||
GR | 06.04.2022 | ||
IS | 05.05.2022 | ||
PT | 05.05.2022 | ||
Former [2023/01] | AL | 05.01.2022 | |
CZ | 05.01.2022 | ||
DK | 05.01.2022 | ||
EE | 05.01.2022 | ||
ES | 05.01.2022 | ||
FI | 05.01.2022 | ||
HR | 05.01.2022 | ||
LT | 05.01.2022 | ||
LV | 05.01.2022 | ||
PL | 05.01.2022 | ||
RO | 05.01.2022 | ||
RS | 05.01.2022 | ||
SK | 05.01.2022 | ||
SM | 05.01.2022 | ||
BG | 05.04.2022 | ||
NO | 05.04.2022 | ||
GR | 06.04.2022 | ||
IS | 05.05.2022 | ||
PT | 05.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | CZ | 05.01.2022 | |
DK | 05.01.2022 | ||
EE | 05.01.2022 | ||
ES | 05.01.2022 | ||
FI | 05.01.2022 | ||
HR | 05.01.2022 | ||
LT | 05.01.2022 | ||
LV | 05.01.2022 | ||
PL | 05.01.2022 | ||
RO | 05.01.2022 | ||
RS | 05.01.2022 | ||
SK | 05.01.2022 | ||
SM | 05.01.2022 | ||
BG | 05.04.2022 | ||
NO | 05.04.2022 | ||
GR | 06.04.2022 | ||
IS | 05.05.2022 | ||
PT | 05.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/48] | CZ | 05.01.2022 | |
DK | 05.01.2022 | ||
EE | 05.01.2022 | ||
ES | 05.01.2022 | ||
FI | 05.01.2022 | ||
HR | 05.01.2022 | ||
LT | 05.01.2022 | ||
LV | 05.01.2022 | ||
PL | 05.01.2022 | ||
RO | 05.01.2022 | ||
RS | 05.01.2022 | ||
SM | 05.01.2022 | ||
BG | 05.04.2022 | ||
NO | 05.04.2022 | ||
GR | 06.04.2022 | ||
IS | 05.05.2022 | ||
PT | 05.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/47] | DK | 05.01.2022 | |
ES | 05.01.2022 | ||
FI | 05.01.2022 | ||
HR | 05.01.2022 | ||
LT | 05.01.2022 | ||
LV | 05.01.2022 | ||
PL | 05.01.2022 | ||
RO | 05.01.2022 | ||
RS | 05.01.2022 | ||
SM | 05.01.2022 | ||
BG | 05.04.2022 | ||
NO | 05.04.2022 | ||
GR | 06.04.2022 | ||
IS | 05.05.2022 | ||
PT | 05.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/46] | DK | 05.01.2022 | |
ES | 05.01.2022 | ||
FI | 05.01.2022 | ||
HR | 05.01.2022 | ||
LT | 05.01.2022 | ||
LV | 05.01.2022 | ||
PL | 05.01.2022 | ||
RS | 05.01.2022 | ||
BG | 05.04.2022 | ||
NO | 05.04.2022 | ||
GR | 06.04.2022 | ||
IS | 05.05.2022 | ||
PT | 05.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/42] | ES | 05.01.2022 | |
FI | 05.01.2022 | ||
HR | 05.01.2022 | ||
LT | 05.01.2022 | ||
LV | 05.01.2022 | ||
PL | 05.01.2022 | ||
RS | 05.01.2022 | ||
BG | 05.04.2022 | ||
NO | 05.04.2022 | ||
GR | 06.04.2022 | ||
IS | 05.05.2022 | ||
PT | 05.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/39] | ES | 05.01.2022 | |
FI | 05.01.2022 | ||
HR | 05.01.2022 | ||
LT | 05.01.2022 | ||
LV | 05.01.2022 | ||
PL | 05.01.2022 | ||
RS | 05.01.2022 | ||
BG | 05.04.2022 | ||
NO | 05.04.2022 | ||
GR | 06.04.2022 | ||
PT | 05.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/36] | ES | 05.01.2022 | |
HR | 05.01.2022 | ||
LT | 05.01.2022 | ||
LV | 05.01.2022 | ||
PL | 05.01.2022 | ||
RS | 05.01.2022 | ||
BG | 05.04.2022 | ||
NO | 05.04.2022 | ||
GR | 06.04.2022 | ||
PT | 05.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/35] | ES | 05.01.2022 | |
HR | 05.01.2022 | ||
LT | 05.01.2022 | ||
RS | 05.01.2022 | ||
BG | 05.04.2022 | ||
NO | 05.04.2022 | ||
PT | 05.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/34] | ES | 05.01.2022 | |
LT | 05.01.2022 | ||
NO | 05.04.2022 | ||
PT | 05.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/33] | LT | 05.01.2022 | |
NO | 05.04.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2016348191 (LEE YEONHEE [KR], et al) [A] 1-5* claims 1-15 *; | [A]KR20190060271 (KO BIOLABS INC [KR]) [A] 1-5 * the whole document *; | [A] - MAR?A SALAS-JARA ET AL, "Biofilm Forming Lactobacillus: New Challenges for the Development of Probiotics", MICROORGANISMS, (20160920), vol. 4, no. 4, doi:10.3390/microorganisms4030035, page 35, XP055431439 [A] 1-5 * page 7, paragraph 4 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.3390/microorganisms4030035 | [A] - AOUDIA NABIL ET AL, "Biofilms ofLactobacillus plantarumandLactobacillus fermentum: Effect on stress responses, antagonistic effects on pathogen growth and immunomodulatory properties", FOOD MICROBIOLOGY, ACADEMIC PRESS LTD, LONDON, GB, (20150429), vol. 53, doi:10.1016/J.FM.2015.04.009, ISSN 0740-0020, pages 51 - 59, XP029316563 [A] 1-5 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.fm.2015.04.009 | by applicant | PL204931 | PL210465 | KR101452234B | CA3018035 | WO2019103198 | - WALTERWALTER JTANNOCK GWTILSALA-TIMISJARVI ARODTONG SLOACH DMMUNRO KALATOSSAVA T et al., "Detection and identification of gastrointestinal Lactobacillus species by using denaturing gradient gel electrophoresis and species-specific PCR primers", Appl Environ Microbiol, (20000000), vol. 66, no. 1, pages 297 - 303 | - DASHKEVICZ M.P.FEIGHNER S.D., "Development of a differential medium for bile salt hydrolase-active Lactobacillus spp", Applied and Environmental Microbiology, (19890000), vol. 55, no. 1, pages 1 - 16 | - TUOMOLA E.M.SALMINEN S.J., "Adhesion of some probiotic and dairy Lactobacillus strains to Caco-2 cell cultures", Int J Food Microbiol, (19980000), vol. 41, doi:10.1016/S0168-1605(98)00033-6, pages 45 - 51, XP002336309 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0168-1605(98)00033-6 | - REUTERREUTER M.MALLETT A.PEARSON BMVAN VILET HM et al., "Biofilm formation by Campylobacter jejuni is increased under aerobic conditions", Appl. Environ. Microbiol., (20100000), vol. 76, pages 2122 - 2128 | - TALLON R.ARIAS S.BRESSOLLIER P.URDACI M.C., "Strain- and matrix-dependent adhesion of Lactobacillus plantarum is mediated by proteinaceous bacterial compounds", Journal of Applied Microbiology, (20060000), vol. 102, pages 442 - 451 |