EP3982076 - A HEAT EXCHANGER WITH A CONNECTOR BLOCK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.02.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 11.03.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.02.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.03.2023 [2023/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Valeo Autosystemy SP. Z.O.O. Przemyslowa 3 32-050 Skawina / PL | [2022/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STANEK, Lukasz 32-050 Skawina / PL | 02 /
SZOSTEK, Dawid 32-050 Skawina / PL | 03 /
POKRYWINSKI, Karol 32-050 Skawina / PL | 04 /
BELZOWSKI, Michal 32-050 Skawina / PL | 05 /
WOZEK, Mateusz 32-050 Skawina / PL | 06 /
NAWROCKI, Mateusz 32-050 Skawina / PL | [2022/15] | Representative(s) | Valeo Systèmes Thermiques Service Propriété Intellectuelle ZA l'Agiot, 8 rue Louis Lormand CS 80517 La Verrière 78322 Le Mesnil-Saint-Denis Cedex / FR | [2022/15] | Application number, filing date | 20461566.0 | 07.10.2020 | [2022/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3982076 | Date: | 13.04.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.02.2021 | Classification | IPC: | F28F9/00 | [2022/15] | CPC: |
F28F9/0251 (EP);
F28F21/067 (EP);
F28F9/0253 (EP);
F28D1/05366 (EP);
F28D2021/0068 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/15] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | WÄRMETAUSCHER MIT EINEM ANSCHLUSSBLOCK | [2022/15] | English: | A HEAT EXCHANGER WITH A CONNECTOR BLOCK | [2022/15] | French: | ÉCHANGEUR DE CHALEUR DOTÉ D'UN BLOC CONNECTEUR | [2022/15] | Examination procedure | 14.10.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/12] | 07.11.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2023/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US5477919 (KARUBE TOSHIKATSU [JP]) [Y] 1-14 * figure 5 *; | [Y]JP2003185385 (DENSO CORP) [Y] 1-14 * paragraph [0021]; figures 7,8 * * paragraph [0023] *; | [Y]US2005274504 (TORIGOE EIICHI [JP]) [Y] 1-14 * paragraph [0040]; figure 1a *; | [Y]US2010066077 (SHARMA RAJEEV [US]) [Y] 1-14 * paragraph [0023]; figure 7 *; | [Y]EP3671098 (VALEO AUTOSYSTEMY SP ZOO [PL]) [Y] 1-14 * figure 2a *; | [A]EP3671068 (VALEO AUTOSYSTEMY SP ZOO [PL]) [A] 5-7* figure 6 *; | [A]EP3708928 (VALEO AUTOSYSTEMY SP ZOO [PL]) [A] 5-7 * figure 2.1 * |