EP4015876 - VEHICLE MECHANICAL SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.05.2023 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 20.05.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 12.02.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.05.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.06.2023 [2023/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Vitesco Technologies Germany GmbH Siemensstraße 12 93055 Regensburg / DE | [2022/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Farago-Boian, Andrei 81737 München / DE | 02 /
Lazar, Dalin 81737 München / DE | 03 /
Hardaut, Sorin Catalin 81737 München / DE | [2022/25] | Representative(s) | Vitesco Technologies Landsberger Str. 187, Haus D 80687 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2022/25] | Vitesco Technologies Postfach 12 02 82019 Taufkirchen / DE | Application number, filing date | 20465602.9 | 17.12.2020 | [2022/25] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4015876 | Date: | 22.06.2022 | Language: | DE | [2022/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.09.2021 | Classification | IPC: | F16H57/032 | [2022/25] | CPC: |
F16H57/032 (EP);
F16H2057/02082 (EP);
F16H2057/02091 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/25] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FAHRZEUG-MECHANIKSYSTEM | [2022/25] | English: | VEHICLE MECHANICAL SYSTEM | [2022/25] | French: | SYSTÈME MÉCANIQUE DU VÉHICULE | [2022/25] | Examination procedure | deleted | Deletion: Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2022/25] | 23.12.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/25] | 03.02.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2023/25] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the search fee | 21.04.2021 | Request for further processing filed | 21.04.2021 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 04.05.2021 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the filing fee | 21.04.2021 | Request for further processing filed | 21.04.2021 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 04.05.2021 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2022 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5799548 (BROOKS HENRY MARSHALL [US], et al) [A] 1-11,14* column 4, paragraph 1; figure 1 *; | [A]WO2005120798 (INTEGRAL TECHNOLOGIES INC [US], et al) [A] 1-11,14 * page 29, paragraph 2; figures 1-4 * |