EP3908733 - DOWNHOLE METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 05.01.2023 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.10.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 18.07.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 15.01.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.01.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Welltec A/S Gydevang 25 3450 Allerød / DK | [2022/08] |
Former [2021/46] | For all designated states Welltec Oilfield Solutions AG Baarerstrasse 96 6300 Zug / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KRÜGER, Christian c/o Welltec Oilfield Solutions AG Baarerstrasse 96 6300 Zug / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2021/46] | 01 /
KRÜGER, Christian 6300 Zug / CH | Representative(s) | Dragsted Partners A/S Rådhuspladsen 16 1550 Copenhagen V / DK | [2021/46] | Application number, filing date | 20700153.8 | 07.01.2020 | [2021/46] | WO2020EP50155 | Priority number, date | EP20190150862 | 08.01.2019 Original published format: EP 19150862 | EP20190201290 | 03.10.2019 Original published format: EP 19201290 | EP20190201492 | 04.10.2019 Original published format: EP 19201492 | [2021/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020144148 | Date: | 16.07.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3908733 | Date: | 17.11.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.07.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.07.2020 | Classification | IPC: | E21B29/00, E21B29/08, E21B33/127, E21B33/129 | [2021/46] | CPC: |
E21B33/127 (EP);
E21B29/005 (EP,US);
E21B23/01 (US);
E21B29/08 (EP);
E21B33/12 (US);
E21B33/1293 (EP);
E21B33/138 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/46] | Title | German: | BOHRLOCHVERFAHREN | [2021/46] | English: | DOWNHOLE METHOD | [2021/46] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE FOND DE PUITS | [2021/46] | Entry into regional phase | 19.07.2021 | National basic fee paid | 19.07.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.07.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.07.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.07.2021 | Examination requested [2021/46] | 19.07.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 04.01.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.04.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2481637 (YANCEY JOHN R) [A] 1-15 * column 1, line 1 - column 4, line 10 * * figures 1-5 *; | [Y]US2011000668 (TUNGET BRUCE A [GB]) [Y] 5,6 * paragraphs [0174] , [ 0180] *; | [A]NO20180152 (HYDRA SYSTEMS AS [NO]) [A] 1-15 * page 1, line 4 - page 22, line 11 ** figures 1-10 *; | [IY]US2018106124 (HAZEL PAUL [GB]) [I] 1-4,7-15 * paragraphs [0066] - [0080] * * figures 1-9 * [Y] 5,6 |