EP3912167 - RECRUITING OF PATIENTS FOR MEDICAMENT STUDIES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 23.06.2023 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.10.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.07.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 15.01.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.12.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bayer Aktiengesellschaft Kaiser-Wilhelm-Allee 1 51373 Leverkusen / DE | [2021/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MÜLLER, Christian, Johannes Am Scherfenbrand 56 51375 Leverkusen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2021/47] | 01 /
MÜLLER, Christian, Johannes 51375 Leverkusen / DE | Representative(s) | BIP Patents c/o Bayer Intellectual Property GmbH Alfred-Nobel-Straße 50 40789 Monheim am Rhein / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2021/47] | BIP Patents c/o Bayer Intellectual Property GmbH Alfred-Nobel-Straße 10 40789 Monheim am Rhein / DE | Application number, filing date | 20700168.6 | 13.01.2020 | [2021/47] | WO2020EP50635 | Priority number, date | EP20190152557 | 18.01.2019 Original published format: EP 19152557 | [2021/47] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020148199 | Date: | 23.07.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3912167 | Date: | 24.11.2021 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.07.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.07.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G16H40/20 | [2021/47] | CPC: |
G16H40/20 (EP);
G16H10/20 (EP,US);
G06Q30/01 (EP);
G06Q30/018 (EP);
G06Q30/0201 (EP);
G06Q50/22 (EP);
G16H70/40 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/47] | Title | German: | REKRUTIERUNG VON PATIENTEN FÜR ARZNEIMITTELSTUDIEN | [2021/47] | English: | RECRUITING OF PATIENTS FOR MEDICAMENT STUDIES | [2021/47] | French: | RECRUTEMENT DE PATIENTS POUR DES ÉTUDES SUR DES MÉDICAMENTS | [2021/47] | Entry into regional phase | 18.08.2021 | National basic fee paid | 18.08.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.08.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.08.2021 | Examination requested [2021/47] | 18.08.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 03.01.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.06.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.08.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Divisional application(s) | EP23190920.1 / EP4266323 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [I]DE102006060065 (GIESECKE & DEVRIENT GMBH [DE]) [I] 1-15 * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0005] * * paragraph [0014] - paragraph [0035] * * paragraph [0040] - paragraph [0046] *; | [I]US2016147963 (BOUHNIK YORAM [FR]) [I] 1-15 * paragraph [0017] - paragraph [0068] ** paragraph [0074] - paragraph [0099] * | by applicant | WO2004092912 | US2008177573 | WO2015127245 | WO2018224156 |