EP3912154 - PERFORATED STRUCTURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 29.02.2024 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.10.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.07.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 15.01.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.06.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Philip Morris Products S.A. Quai Jeanrenaud 3 2000 Neuchâtel / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2021/47] | For all designated states Philip Morris Products, S.A. Quai Jeanrenaud 3 2000 Neuchâtel / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HERVE, Pierre Quai Jeanrenaud 3 2000 Neuchâtel / CH | 02 /
MAJEED, Shoaib Quai Jeanrenaud 3 2000 Neuchâtel / CH | 03 /
SANDOZ, Antonin Quai Jeanrenaud 3 2000 Neuchâtel / CH | 04 /
STEINER, Sandro Quai Jeanrenaud 3 2000 Neuchâtel / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2021/47] | 01 /
HERVE, Pierre 2000 Neuchâtel / CH | ||
02 /
MAJEED, Shoaib 2000 Neuchâtel / CH | |||
03 /
SANDOZ, Antonin 2000 Neuchâtel / CH | |||
04 /
STEINER, Sandro 2000 Neuchâtel / CH | Representative(s) | Script Intellectual Property LLP Suite J, Anchor House School Close Chandlers Ford Eastleigh, Hampshire SO53 4DY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2021/47] | Script IP Limited Turnpike House 18 Bridge Street Frome Somerset BA11 1BB / GB | Application number, filing date | 20700177.7 | 13.01.2020 | [2021/47] | WO2020EP50725 | Priority number, date | EP20190151940 | 15.01.2019 Original published format: EP 19151940 | [2021/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020148238 | Date: | 23.07.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3912154 | Date: | 24.11.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.07.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.07.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G09B23/32, G16H10/40 | [2021/47] | CPC: |
G09B23/32 (EP,KR,US);
F04B37/20 (US);
G09B23/30 (US);
G16H50/50 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/47] | Title | German: | PERFORIERTE STRUKTUR | [2021/47] | English: | PERFORATED STRUCTURE | [2021/47] | French: | STRUCTURE PERFORÉE | [2021/47] | Entry into regional phase | 05.08.2021 | National basic fee paid | 05.08.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.08.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.11.2020 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 05.08.2021 | Examination requested [2021/47] | 05.08.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 28.02.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.02.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.06.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XAI]US4167070 (ORDEN BURT B); | [A]US5597310 (EDDE PIERRE [US]); | [A]WO03027223 (CORNELL RES FOUNDATION INC [US], et al); | [A]WO2010141803 (GEN HOSPITAL CORP [US], et al); | [A]WO2018075543 (REYNOLDS TOBACCO CO R [US]); | [AP]WO2019016094 (PHILIP MORRIS PRODUCTS SA [CH]); |