Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2022064389 | Global Dossier | 03.03.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2020EP50681 | 13.01.2020 | EP19152323 | 17.01.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20210117296 | Global Dossier | 28.09.2021 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2020EP50681 | 13.01.2020 | EP19152323 | 17.01.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN113302230B | Global Dossier | 03.10.2023 | B | CN113302230 | 24.08.2021 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2020EP50681 | 13.01.2020 | EP19152323 | 17.01.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3911692 | Global Dossier | 24.11.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2020EP50681 | 13.01.2020 | EP19152323 | 17.01.2019 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2020148229 | Global Dossier | 23.07.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP19152323 | 17.01.2019 |