EP3914682 - LAUNDRY DETERGENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 13.09.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 05.06.2024 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 31.03.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.10.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 03.08.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 20.01.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For:AL
AT
BE
BG
CH
CZ
DK
EE
ES
FI
FR
GR
HR
HU
IS
LI
LT
LU
LV
MC
MK
NL
NO
PL
PT
RO
SE
SI
SK
SM
Unilever IP Holdings B.V. Weena 455 3013 AL Rotterdam / NL | For:CY
DE
GB
IE
IT
MT
RS
TR
UNILEVER GLOBAL IP LIMITED Port Sunlight Wirral Merseyside CH62 4ZD / GB | [2021/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BATCHELOR, Stephen Norman Unilever R&D Port Sunlight Quarry Road East Bebington Wirral Merseyside CH63 3JW / GB | 02 /
BURNHAM, Neil Stephen Unilever R&D Port Sunlight Quarry Road East Bebington Wirral Merseyside CH63 3JW / GB | [2024/27] |
Former [2021/48] | 01 /
BATCHELOR, Stephen, Norman Wirral Merseyside CH63 3JW / GB | ||
02 /
BURNHAM, Neil, Stephen Wirral Merseyside CH63 3JW / GB | Representative(s) | Brooijmans, Rob Josephina Wilhelmus Unilever Patent Group Bronland 14 6708 WH Wageningen / NL | [2024/42] |
Former [2021/48] | Brooijmans, Rob Josephina Wilhelmus Unilever N.V. Unilever Patent Group Bronland 14 6708 WH Wageningen / NL | Application number, filing date | 20700390.6 | 14.01.2020 | [2021/48] | WO2020EP50754 | Priority number, date | EP20190153073 | 22.01.2019 Original published format: EP 19153073 | [2021/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020151992 | Date: | 30.07.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3914682 | Date: | 01.12.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.07.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3914682 | Date: | 16.10.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.07.2020 | Classification | IPC: | C11D3/40, C09B29/00 | [2024/24] | CPC: |
C11D3/40 (EP,US);
C11D3/349 (US);
C09B29/0033 (EP);
C09B29/0059 (US);
C09B29/0808 (EP);
C09B31/105 (EP);
C09B62/0086 (EP);
C09B69/00 (EP);
C11D1/83 (US);
|
Former IPC [2021/48] | C11D3/40, C11D11/00, C09B29/00, C09B31/10, C09B62/00, C09B69/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/48] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | WASCHMITTEL | [2021/48] | English: | LAUNDRY DETERGENT | [2021/48] | French: | DÉTERGENT POUR LESSIVE | [2024/24] |
Former [2021/48] | DÉTERGENT À LESSIVE | Entry into regional phase | 15.06.2021 | National basic fee paid | 15.06.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.06.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.11.2020 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 15.06.2021 | Examination requested [2021/48] | 15.06.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 07.01.2022 | Observations by third parties | 30.03.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.04.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.06.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.09.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 09.09.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 09.09.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [I]WO2007084729 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US], et al); | [ID]WO2011017719 (MILLIKEN & CO [US], et al); | [ID]WO2011098356 (UNILEVER PLC [GB], et al); | [I]WO2015042209 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) | by applicant | JPS64744992B | GB1296839 | GB1372034 | EP0070074 | US4435307 | EP0218272 | EP0258068 | EP0260105 | EP0305216 | EP0328177 | EP0331376 | WO8909259 | EP0346995 | US4912203 | EP0384070 | EP0407225 | WO9116422 | WO9205249 | WO9219709 | WO9219708 | WO9324618 | WO9401541 | WO9425578 | WO9506720 | WO9510602 | WO9514783 | WO9522615 | WO9526397 | WO9530744 | WO9535381 | WO9600292 | WO9612012 | WO9613580 | WO9627002 | WO9629397 | WO9704079 | WO9707202 | US5648263 | US5691178 | WO9812307 | WO9815257 | US5776757 | WO0060063 | WO0060060 | WO2006053598 | WO2009087524 | WO2009090576 | WO2009107091 | WO2009111258 | WO2009148983 | WO2011017719 | WO2011098356 | WO2012054835 | WO2012054058 | WO2013189615 | WO2018085315 | WO2018085300 | WO2018085301 | WO2018085302 | WO2018085303 | WO2018085304 | WO2018085305 | WO2018085306 | WO2018085308 | WO2018085309 | WO2018085310 | WO2018085311 | WO2018085312 | WO2018085313 | WO2018085314 |