EP3909369 - UPLINK CONTROL INFORMATION PRE-EMPTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 11.08.2023 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.10.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 18.07.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 28.01.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.02.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TELEFONAKTIEBOLAGET LM ERICSSON (PUBL) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | [2021/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZOU, Zhenhua Nybodagatan 16 Igh 1114 17142 Solna / SE | 02 /
FRÖBERG OLSSON, Jonas Nilsbovägen 9 59074 Ljungsbro / SE | 03 /
ALABBASI, Abdulrahman Helsingörsgatan 32 16444 Kista / SE | 04 /
ANDERSSON, Mattias Humblegatan 28 B 17239 Sundbyberg / SE | 05 /
BLANKENSHIP, Yufei 21910 W. Pine Lake Circle Kildeer, IL 60047 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2021/46] | 01 /
ZOU, Zhenhua 17142 Solna / SE | ||
02 /
FRÖBERG OLSSON, Jonas 59074 Ljungsbro / SE | |||
03 /
ALABBASI, Abdulrahman 16444 Kista / SE | |||
04 /
ANDERSSON, Mattias 17239 Sundbyberg / SE | |||
05 /
BLANKENSHIP, Yufei Kildeer, IL 60047 / US | Representative(s) | Ericsson Patent Development Torshamnsgatan 21-23 164 80 Stockholm / SE | [2021/46] | Application number, filing date | 20700972.1 | 09.01.2020 | [2021/46] | WO2020EP50470 | Priority number, date | US201962790896P | 10.01.2019 Original published format: US 201962790896 P | [2021/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020144299 | Date: | 16.07.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3909369 | Date: | 17.11.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.07.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.07.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H04W72/12, H04L5/00, H04W72/04 | [2021/46] | CPC: |
H04W72/1268 (EP);
H04W72/21 (EP,US);
H04L5/0044 (EP);
H04L5/0051 (US);
H04L5/0053 (EP);
H04W72/1263 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/46] | Title | German: | PRÄEMPTION VON UPLINK-STEUERUNGSINFORMATIONEN | [2021/46] | English: | UPLINK CONTROL INFORMATION PRE-EMPTION | [2021/46] | French: | PRÉEMPTION D'INFORMATIONS DE COMMANDE DE LIAISON MONTANTE | [2021/46] | Entry into regional phase | 27.07.2021 | National basic fee paid | 27.07.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.07.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.07.2021 | Examination requested [2021/46] | 27.07.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 08.03.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.08.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.02.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]EP2562949 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]); | [XI]WO2018203409 (NTT DOCOMO INC [JP]) |