EP3908716 - FAÇADE CONSTRUCTION AND/OR WALL CONSTRUCTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 08.02.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.10.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 18.07.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 28.01.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.07.2024 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Moeding Keramikfassaden GmbH Ludwig-Girnghuber-Strasse 1 84163 Marklkofen / DE | [2021/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GIRNGHUBER, Claus Fellerhof 2 84163 Marklkofen / DE | 02 /
WAGNER, Rudolf Niederviehbacher Straße 75 94315 Straubing / DE | 03 /
MÜLLER, Dietmar Eulenweg 5 84160 Frontenhausen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2021/46] | 01 /
GIRNGHUBER, Claus 84163 Marklkofen / DE | ||
02 /
WAGNER, Rudolf 94315 Straubing / DE | |||
03 /
MÜLLER, Dietmar 84160 Frontenhausen / DE | Representative(s) | Louis Pöhlau Lohrentz Patentanwälte Merianstrasse 26 90409 Nürnberg / DE | [2021/46] | Application number, filing date | 20700975.4 | 10.01.2020 | [2021/46] | WO2020EP50552 | Priority number, date | DE201910100486 | 10.01.2019 Original published format: DE102019100486 | DE201910100498 | 10.01.2019 Original published format: DE102019100498 | [2021/46] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020144334 | Date: | 16.07.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3908716 | Date: | 17.11.2021 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.07.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.07.2020 | Classification | IPC: | E04F13/08 | [2021/46] | CPC: |
E04F13/0803 (EP,US);
E04F13/0862 (EP,US);
E04F13/0826 (EP);
E04B2/7407 (EP);
E04B2/90 (EP);
E04B2001/3583 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/46] | Title | German: | FASSADEN- UND/ODER WANDKONSTRUKTION | [2021/46] | English: | FAÇADE CONSTRUCTION AND/OR WALL CONSTRUCTION | [2021/46] | French: | STRUCTURE DE FAÇADE ET/OU DE PAROI | [2021/46] | Entry into regional phase | 16.07.2021 | National basic fee paid | 16.07.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.07.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.07.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.07.2021 | Examination requested [2021/46] | 16.07.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 09.02.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.07.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2023 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   17.02.2023 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]FR2183470 (GULF OIL CORP [US]) [A] 1* page 2, line 24 - page 7, line 8; figure - *; | [XY]DE2919706 (SCHULZE HERBERT DIETRICH GMBH) [X] 1 * page 11, paragraph last - page 14, paragraph last; figure - * [Y] 24,25; | [Y]US5184440 (FELIX ANDRE [CH], et al) [Y] 4,6 * column 4, line 15 - column 10, line 19; figure - *; | [YD]CN201080660Y (BEIJING JIANGHE CURTAIN WALL C [CN]) [YD] 14-17,19,26,27 * abstract *; | [XAYI]CN107587684 (WENLING PULI BUILDING MATERIALS TECH CO LTD) [X] 1-3,5,7-13,18,20-23,28,31-33,35,36 * paragraph [0025] - paragraph [0036]; figure - * [A] 29,30 [Y] 4,6,14-17,19,24-27 [I] 34 |