EP3911245 - INTEGRATED POWER UNIT IPU [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 12.07.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.10.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.07.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 29.01.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.07.2024 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | 12.07.2024 | First examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Aesculap AG Am Aesculap-Platz 78532 Tuttlingen / DE | [2021/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HÖGERLE, Roland-Alois Kammerhalde 22 78532 Tuttlingen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2021/47] | 01 /
HÖGERLE, Roland-Alois 78532 Tuttlingen / DE | Representative(s) | Winter, Brandl - Partnerschaft mbB Alois-Steinecker-Straße 22 85354 Freising / DE | [2021/47] | Application number, filing date | 20701155.2 | 14.01.2020 | [2021/47] | WO2020EP50807 | Priority number, date | DE201910101308 | 18.01.2019 Original published format: DE102019101308 | [2021/47] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020148275 | Date: | 23.07.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3911245 | Date: | 24.11.2021 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.07.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.07.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/00, A61B17/16, A61B90/90 | [2021/47] | CPC: |
A61B17/1626 (EP);
A61B17/00234 (EP,US);
A61B90/90 (EP);
A61B2017/00199 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00212 (EP);
A61B2017/00221 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00225 (EP);
A61B2017/00734 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00973 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/47] | Title | German: | INTEGRIERTE LEISTUNGSEINHEIT IPU | [2021/47] | English: | INTEGRATED POWER UNIT IPU | [2021/47] | French: | UNITÉ DE PUISSANCE INTÉGRÉE IPU | [2021/47] | Entry into regional phase | 03.08.2021 | National basic fee paid | 03.08.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.08.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.08.2021 | Examination requested [2021/47] | 03.08.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 23.11.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.07.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]EP3070627 (COVIDIEN LP [US]); | [XYI]US2016375273 (HIRAI YUJI [JP], et al) | by applicant | WO0121056 | EP1326565 | DE102005029458 | EP1567063 | DE102013114918 | EP3032513 |