19.07.2024 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 21.08.2024 [2024/34] |
12.07.2024 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
12.07.2024 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
12.07.2024 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
13.03.2024 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
23.02.2024 |
Change - classification |
published on 27.03.2024 [2024/13] |
23.02.2024 |
Change - classification |
published on 27.03.2024 [2024/13] |
23.02.2024 |
Change - German title |
published on 27.03.2024 [2024/13] |
23.02.2024 |
Change - French title |
published on 27.03.2024 [2024/13] |
29.01.2024 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
30.01.2023 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
18.03.2022 |
Change: Validation states |
published on 20.04.2022 [2022/16] |
18.03.2022 |
Change - extension states |
published on 20.04.2022 [2022/16] |
07.03.2022 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
28.01.2022 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
24.01.2022 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
15.10.2021 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 17.11.2021 [2021/46] |
15.10.2021 |
The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established |
|
15.10.2021 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 17.11.2021 [2021/46] |
21.09.2021 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
01.09.2021 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
11.08.2021 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
11.08.2021 |
New entry: Fee payment for validation state |
|
10.08.2021 |
Change - representative |
|
10.08.2021 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
18.07.2020 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
18.07.2020 |
New entry: applicant or inventor |
|
17.03.2020 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
31.01.2020 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|