EP3908109 - DEVICE AND METHOD FOR DISPENSING A PARTICULATE MATERIAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 19.07.2024 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 13.03.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.10.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 18.07.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 31.01.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.07.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 21.08.2024 [2024/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koppert B.V. Veilingweg 14 2651 BE Berkel en Rodenrijs / NL | [2021/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VEENMAN, Arend c/o Veilingweg 14 2651 BE Berkel en Rodenrijs / NL | 02 /
VEENMAN, Sjors c/o Veilingweg 14 2651 BE Berkel en Rodenrijs / NL | 03 /
DE GLOPPER, Maarten Henk c/o Veilingweg 14 2651 BE Berkel en Rodenrijs / NL | [2024/34] |
Former [2021/46] | 01 /
VEENMAN, Arend 2651 BE Berkel en Rodenrijs / NL | ||
02 /
VEENMAN, Sjors 2651 BE Berkel en Rodenrijs / NL | |||
03 /
DE GLOPPER, Maarten Henk 2651 BE Berkel en Rodenrijs / NL | Representative(s) | Patentwerk B.V. P.O. Box 1514 5200 BN 's-Hertogenbosch / NL | [2021/46] | Application number, filing date | 20701379.8 | 13.01.2020 | [2021/46] | WO2020NL50016 | Priority number, date | NL20192022384 | 11.01.2019 Original published format: NL 2022384 | [2021/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020145827 | Date: | 16.07.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3908109 | Date: | 17.11.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.07.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3908109 | Date: | 21.08.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.07.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A01C7/16, A01M9/00, A01C15/00 | [2024/13] | CPC: |
A01M9/0053 (EP);
A01C15/006 (US);
A01C7/16 (EP);
A01M9/0069 (EP);
A01M9/0076 (EP);
A01M99/00 (US);
|
Former IPC [2021/46] | A01M9/00, A01C15/00, A01C15/12 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/46] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | 10.08.2021 | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUM AUSBRINGEN VON KÖRNIGEM MATERIAL | [2024/13] | English: | DEVICE AND METHOD FOR DISPENSING A PARTICULATE MATERIAL | [2021/46] | French: | DISPOSITIF ET PROCEDURE POUR DISPERSER DU MATERIEL GRANULAIRE | [2024/13] |
Former [2021/46] | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR ABGABE EINES PARTIKELFÖRMIGEN MATERIALS | ||
Former [2021/46] | DISPOSITIF ET MÉTHODE PERMETTANT DE DISTRIBUER UN MATÉRIAU PARTICULAIRE | Entry into regional phase | 10.08.2021 | National basic fee paid | 10.08.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.08.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.08.2021 | Examination requested [2021/46] | 10.08.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 07.03.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.03.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.07.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 11.07.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 11.07.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]JPS5648720U ; | [A]JPS58117816U ; | [A]DE4004497 (AMAZONEN WERKE DREYER H [DE]); | [A]EP0508170 (AMAZONEN WERKE DREYER H [DE]); | [XA]EP0829194 (MAASLAND NV [NL]); | [A]WO2017106903 (AEROBUGS PTY LTD [AU]) | by applicant | AU2015101838 |