EP4091104 - DATA INTERPRETATION SYSTEM, VEHICLE, METHOD FOR INTERPRETING INPUT DATA, COMPUTER PROGRAM AND COMPUTER-READABLE MEDIUM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 22.02.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.10.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 23.07.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 01.02.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.06.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Toyota Motor Europe Avenue du Bourget 60 1140 Brussels / BE | For all designated states ETH Zurich - The Swiss Federal Institute of Technology Zurich Raemistrasse 101 8092 Zurich / CH | For all designated states Katholieke Universiteit Leuven K.U. Leuven R&D Waaistraat 6 box 5105 3000 Leuven / BE | [2022/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ABBELOOS, Wim c/o Toyota Motor Europe Technical Strategic Planning Operation Avenue du Bourget 60 1140 Brussels / BE | 02 /
GEORGOULIS, Stamatios c/o ETH Zurich The Swiss Federal Institute of Technology Zurich Raemistrasse 101 8092 Zurich / CH | 03 /
VAN GOOL, Luc c/o ETH Zurich The Swiss Federal Institute of Technology Zurich Raemistrasse 101 8092 Zurich / CH | 04 /
VANDENHENDE, Simon c/o Katholieke Universiteit Leuven K.U., Leuven R&D Waaistraat 6 - box 5105 3000 Leuven / BE | [2022/47] | Representative(s) | Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | [2022/47] | Application number, filing date | 20701406.9 | 14.01.2020 | [2022/47] | WO2020EP50839 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021144007 | Date: | 22.07.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4091104 | Date: | 23.11.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.07.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.07.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G06N3/00, G06N3/04, G06N3/08 | [2022/47] | CPC: |
G06N3/08 (EP);
G06N3/045 (EP);
G06N3/044 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/47] | Title | German: | DATENINTERPRETATIONSSYSTEM, FAHRZEUG, VERFAHREN ZUR INTERPRETATION VON EINGANGSDATEN, COMPUTERPROGRAMM UND COMPUTERLESBARES MEDIUM | [2022/47] | English: | DATA INTERPRETATION SYSTEM, VEHICLE, METHOD FOR INTERPRETING INPUT DATA, COMPUTER PROGRAM AND COMPUTER-READABLE MEDIUM | [2022/47] | French: | SYSTÈME D'INTERPRÉTATION DE DONNÉES, VÉHICULE, PROCÉDÉ D'INTERPRÉTATION DE DONNÉES D'ENTRÉE, PROGRAMME INFORMATIQUE, ET SUPPORT LISIBLE PAR ORDINATEUR | [2022/47] | Entry into regional phase | 05.07.2022 | National basic fee paid | 05.07.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.07.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.07.2022 | Examination requested [2022/47] | 05.07.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 24.02.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.02.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.06.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XDI] - XU DAN ET AL, "PAD-Net: Multi-tasks Guided Prediction-and-Distillation Network for Simultaneous Depth Estimation and Scene Parsing", 2018 IEEE/CVF CONFERENCE ON COMPUTER VISION AND PATTERN RECOGNITION, IEEE, (20180618), doi:10.1109/CVPR.2018.00077, pages 675 - 684, XP033476028 [XD] 1,5-9,11,13-16 * the whole document * [I] 2-4,10,12 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/CVPR.2018.00077 | [A] - YE LYU ET AL, "LIP: Learning Instance Propagation for Video Object Segmentation", ARXIV.ORG, CORNELL UNIVERSITY LIBRARY, 201 OLIN LIBRARY CORNELL UNIVERSITY ITHACA, NY 14853, (20190930), XP081498371 [A] 1-16 * the whole document * | by applicant | - TSUN-YI LINPIOTR DOLL'ARROSS GIRSHICKKAIMING HEBHARATH HARIHARANSERGE BELONGIE, "Feature pyramid networks for object detection", CVPR, (20170000), pages 2117 - 2125 | - KE SUNBIN XIAODONG LIUJINGDONG WANG, "Deep high-resolution representation learning for human pose estimation", CVPR, (20190000), pages 5693 - 5703 | - DAN XUWANLI OUYANGXIAOGANG WANGNICU SEBE, "Pad-net: Multi-tasks guided prediction-and-distillation network for simultaneous depth estimation and scene parsing", CVPR, (20180000), doi:10.1109/CVPR.2018.00077, pages 675 - 684, XP033476028 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/CVPR.2018.00077 | - ZHENYU ZHANGZHEN CUICHUNYAN XUYAN YANNICU SEBEJIAN YANG, "Pattern-affinitive propagation across depth, surface normal and semantic segmentation", CVPR, (20190000), pages 4106 - 4115 | - JIE HULI SHENGANG SUN, "Squeeze-and-excitation networks", CVPR, (20180000), doi:10.1109/CVPR.2018.00745, pages 7132 - 7141, XP055617919 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/CVPR.2018.00745 | - ALEXANDER KIRILLOVROSS GIRSHICKKAIMING HEPIOTR DOLL'AR, "Panoptic feature pyramid networks", CVPR, (20190000), pages 6399 - 6408 | - KAIMING HEXIANGYU ZHANGSHAOQING RENJIAN SUN, "Deep residual learning for image recognition", CVPR, (20160000), doi:10.1109/CVPR.2016.90, pages 770 - 778, XP055536240 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/CVPR.2016.90 | - ZHENYU ZHANGZHEN CUICHUNYAN XUZEQUN JIEXIANG LIJIAN YANG, "Joint task-recursive learning for semantic segmentation and depth estimation", ECCV, (20180000), pages 235 - 251 |