EP3911237 - MULTIMODAL IMAGING SYSTEM AND METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.10.2021 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.07.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 03.02.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.08.2024 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Milabs B.V. 100, Heidelberglaan, str 4.105 3584 CX Utrecht / NL | [2021/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BEEKMAN, Frederik Johannes 100, Universiteitsweg STR 5.203 3584 CG Utrecht / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2021/47] | 01 /
BEEKMAN, Frederik Johannes 3584 CG Utrecht / NL | Representative(s) | EP&C P.O. Box 3241 2280 GE Rijswijk / NL | [2021/47] | Application number, filing date | 20701677.5 | 17.01.2020 | [2021/47] | WO2020NL50025 | Priority number, date | NL20192022409 | 17.01.2019 Original published format: NL 2022409 | [2021/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020149743 | Date: | 23.07.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3911237 | Date: | 24.11.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.07.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.07.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A61B6/03, A61B6/00, A61B6/04 | [2021/47] | CPC: |
A61B6/037 (EP,US);
A61B6/032 (EP,US);
A61B6/0487 (US);
A61B6/06 (US);
A61B6/4291 (EP);
A61B6/4411 (US);
A61B6/4417 (EP);
A61B6/54 (US);
G01T1/1648 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/47] | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR MULTIMODALEN BILDGEBUNG | [2021/47] | English: | MULTIMODAL IMAGING SYSTEM AND METHOD | [2021/47] | French: | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ D'IMAGERIE MULTIMODALE | [2021/47] | Entry into regional phase | 05.08.2021 | National basic fee paid | 05.08.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.08.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.08.2021 | Examination requested [2021/47] | 05.08.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 23.02.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.08.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2024 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US5146094 (STARK IAIN E [CA]) [Y] 8,9,11 * abstract * * figures 1-9 * * column 2, line 39 - column 5, line 65 *; | [A]US2007221851 (LUSSER MARKUS [US], et al) [A] 1-19 * abstract * * figures 1-6 ** paragraph [0013] - paragraph [0036] *; | [XAYI]US2008237473 (URIBE JORGE [US], et al) [X] 1,2,5-7,12,16 * abstract * * figures 1-33 * * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0127] * [A] 14,15,18,19 [Y] 8,9,11 [I] 3,4,10,13,17 | by applicant | WO2007133068 | US2013082450 | WO2015152720 |