EP3931018 - MULTIFUNCTIONAL SUPPORT FOR A HEAT ENGINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.08.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 22.09.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 18.05.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.12.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 04.09.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 10.02.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.10.2024 [2024/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Renault s.a.s 122-122 bis avenue du Général Leclerc 92100 Boulogne Billancourt / FR | [2022/30] |
Former [2022/09] | For all designated states Renault s.a.s 13/15, quai Alphonse Le Gallo 92100 Boulogne Billancourt / FR | ||
Former [2022/01] | For all designated states RENAULT s.a.s 13-15 Quai Alphonse Le Gallo 92100 Boulogne-Billancourt / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CAYER, Regis 11 allée des dahlias 92320 CHATILLON / FR | 02 /
DESAFIT, Christophe 16 RUE MAURICE BARRES 78370 PLAISIR / FR | 03 /
MARREL, Sebastien 7 PLACE LOUIS PHILIPPE 28100 DREUX / FR | [2023/43] |
Former [2022/01] | 01 /
CAYER, Regis 92320 CHATILLON / FR | ||
02 /
DESAFIT, Christophe 78370 PLAISIR / FR | |||
03 /
MARREL, Sebastien 28100 DREUX / FR | Representative(s) | Renault Group Renault s.a.s. 1 avenue du Golf FR TCR AVA 055 78084 Guyancourt Cedex / FR | [2023/43] | Application number, filing date | 20702495.1 | 06.02.2020 | [2022/01] | WO2020EP53002 | Priority number, date | FR20190001958 | 26.02.2019 Original published format: FR 1901958 | [2022/01] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020173679 | Date: | 03.09.2020 | Language: | FR | [2020/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3931018 | Date: | 05.01.2022 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.09.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3931018 | Date: | 25.10.2023 | Language: | FR | [2023/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.09.2020 | Classification | IPC: | B60K11/04, F01P5/10, F28F9/00 | [2022/01] | CPC: |
B60K11/04 (EP,KR);
B60Y2304/07 (KR);
B60Y2306/05 (KR);
F01P2070/52 (EP,KR)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/01] | Title | German: | MULTIFUNKTIONSHALTERUNG FÜR EINE WÄRMEKRAFTMASCHINE | [2022/01] | English: | MULTIFUNCTIONAL SUPPORT FOR A HEAT ENGINE | [2022/01] | French: | SUPPORT MULTIFONCTION POUR MOTEUR THERMIQUE | [2022/01] | Entry into regional phase | 29.07.2021 | National basic fee paid | 29.07.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.07.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.07.2021 | Examination requested [2022/01] | 29.07.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 31.03.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.05.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.09.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 14.09.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 14.09.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 26.07.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 01.03.2022 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   25.03.2022 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 25.10.2023 | CZ | 25.10.2023 | DK | 25.10.2023 | EE | 25.10.2023 | ES | 25.10.2023 | HR | 25.10.2023 | IT | 25.10.2023 | LT | 25.10.2023 | LV | 25.10.2023 | NL | 25.10.2023 | PL | 25.10.2023 | RO | 25.10.2023 | RS | 25.10.2023 | SE | 25.10.2023 | SK | 25.10.2023 | SM | 25.10.2023 | BG | 25.01.2024 | NO | 25.01.2024 | GR | 26.01.2024 | IS | 25.02.2024 | PT | 26.02.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/35] | AT | 25.10.2023 | |
CZ | 25.10.2023 | ||
DK | 25.10.2023 | ||
EE | 25.10.2023 | ||
ES | 25.10.2023 | ||
HR | 25.10.2023 | ||
LT | 25.10.2023 | ||
LV | 25.10.2023 | ||
NL | 25.10.2023 | ||
PL | 25.10.2023 | ||
RO | 25.10.2023 | ||
RS | 25.10.2023 | ||
SE | 25.10.2023 | ||
SM | 25.10.2023 | ||
BG | 25.01.2024 | ||
NO | 25.01.2024 | ||
GR | 26.01.2024 | ||
IS | 25.02.2024 | ||
PT | 26.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | AT | 25.10.2023 | |
DK | 25.10.2023 | ||
EE | 25.10.2023 | ||
ES | 25.10.2023 | ||
HR | 25.10.2023 | ||
LT | 25.10.2023 | ||
LV | 25.10.2023 | ||
NL | 25.10.2023 | ||
PL | 25.10.2023 | ||
RS | 25.10.2023 | ||
SE | 25.10.2023 | ||
SM | 25.10.2023 | ||
BG | 25.01.2024 | ||
NO | 25.01.2024 | ||
GR | 26.01.2024 | ||
IS | 25.02.2024 | ||
PT | 26.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | AT | 25.10.2023 | |
DK | 25.10.2023 | ||
ES | 25.10.2023 | ||
HR | 25.10.2023 | ||
LT | 25.10.2023 | ||
LV | 25.10.2023 | ||
NL | 25.10.2023 | ||
PL | 25.10.2023 | ||
RS | 25.10.2023 | ||
SE | 25.10.2023 | ||
SM | 25.10.2023 | ||
BG | 25.01.2024 | ||
NO | 25.01.2024 | ||
GR | 26.01.2024 | ||
IS | 25.02.2024 | ||
PT | 26.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/26] | AT | 25.10.2023 | |
ES | 25.10.2023 | ||
HR | 25.10.2023 | ||
LT | 25.10.2023 | ||
LV | 25.10.2023 | ||
NL | 25.10.2023 | ||
PL | 25.10.2023 | ||
RS | 25.10.2023 | ||
SE | 25.10.2023 | ||
BG | 25.01.2024 | ||
NO | 25.01.2024 | ||
GR | 26.01.2024 | ||
IS | 25.02.2024 | ||
PT | 26.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AT | 25.10.2023 | |
ES | 25.10.2023 | ||
LT | 25.10.2023 | ||
NL | 25.10.2023 | ||
BG | 25.01.2024 | ||
GR | 26.01.2024 | ||
IS | 25.02.2024 | ||
PT | 26.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/21] | LT | 25.10.2023 | |
NL | 25.10.2023 | ||
BG | 25.01.2024 | ||
GR | 26.01.2024 | ||
IS | 25.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | NL | 25.10.2023 | |
GR | 26.01.2024 | ||
IS | 25.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/17] | NL | 25.10.2023 | Cited in | International search | [AD]US7293535 (DOBLER HELMUT [DE], et al) [AD] 5,7,8* the whole document *; | [A]FR2965297 (VALEO SYSTEMES THERMIQUES [FR]) [A] 5,7,8 * figure 1; claims 1-4 *; | [XAI]DE102013202146 (BEHR GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [X] 1-3,6,9-11 * paragraphs [0091] - [0095] - [0101] - [0102]; figures 9-12; claims 11-12 * [A] 5,7,8,12,13 [I] 4; | [A]CN106812582 (BYD CO LTD) [A] 5,7,8 * figures 1-2; claims 1,3 *; | [A]WO2018070375 (DAIKIN IND LTD [JP]) [A] 5,7,8 * paragraphs [0008] , [0022] - [0033]; figure 1 * | by applicant | US7293535 |