EP3920707 - NOVEL FROZEN CONFECTION SHAPED BAKERY ITEM COMPOSITIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 22.09.2023 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.11.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 14.08.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 10.02.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.02.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Unilever IP Holdings B.V. Weena 455 3013 AL Rotterdam / NL | [2021/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DE SIMONE, Antonio Unilever R&D Colworth Sharnbrook Bedford Bedfordshire MK44 1LQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2021/50] | 01 /
DE SIMONE, Antonio Sharnbrook Bedford Bedfordshire MK44 1LQ / GB | Representative(s) | Turner, Felicity Margaret Mary Unilever Patent Group Bronland 14 6708 WH Wageningen / NL | [2021/50] | Application number, filing date | 20702497.7 | 06.02.2020 | [2021/50] | WO2020EP53012 | Priority number, date | EP20190155769 | 06.02.2019 Original published format: EP 19155769 | [2021/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020161251 | Date: | 13.08.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3920707 | Date: | 15.12.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.08.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.08.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A21D13/45, A23G9/50, A21D13/36, A21D13/11 | [2021/50] | CPC: |
A21D13/36 (EP);
A21D13/33 (US);
A21D13/11 (EP,US);
A21D13/45 (EP);
A21D2/165 (US);
A21D2/181 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/50] | Title | German: | NEUARTIGE GEFORMTE GEFRORENE KONFEKTBÄCKEREIARTIKELZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN | [2021/50] | English: | NOVEL FROZEN CONFECTION SHAPED BAKERY ITEM COMPOSITIONS | [2021/50] | French: | NOUVELLES COMPOSITIONS DE PRODUITS DE BOULANGERIE EN FORME DE CONFISERIE CONGELÉES | [2021/50] | Entry into regional phase | 22.07.2021 | National basic fee paid | 22.07.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.07.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.12.2020 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 22.07.2021 | Examination requested [2021/50] | 22.07.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 14.03.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.09.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.11.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2022 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   25.03.2022 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [I]JPH02308750 (ITO SADAMI) [I] 1-14 * abstract * * claims 1,2 * * paragraphs [0001] , [0002] * * figure - *; | [A]CN103999910 (XINJIANG SHENGMINGHELI HIGH TECH CO LTD) [A] 8 * abstract *; | [I] - Anonymous, "Waffelhörnchen: So können Sie Eiswaffeln selber machen", (20150427), pages 1 - 3, URL: https://www.t-online.de/leben/essen-und-trinken/id_73457908/waffelhoernchen-so-koennen-sie-eiswaffeln-selber-machen.html, (20190313), XP055568233 [I] 1-14 * the whole document * | [I] - Anonymous, "Hippen, Eiswaffeln, Glückskekse von Einbeck1968. Ein Thermomix Rezept aus der Kategorie Backen süß auf www.rezeptwelt.de, der Thermomix Community.", (20161015), pages 1 - 5, URL: https://www.rezeptwelt.de/backen-suess-rezepte/hippen-eiswaffeln-glueckskekse/qu9pgnn5-a4767-325970-cfcd2-xpjw3i5i, (20190313), XP055568756 [I] 1-14 * the whole document * | [I] - Anonymous, "Knusprige Waffelhörnchen oder Waffelschalen - Rezept - kochbar.de", (20170915), pages 1 - 2, URL: https://web.archive.org/web/20170915134249/https://www.kochbar.de/rezept/372451/Knusprige-Waffelhoernchen-oder-Waffelschalen.html, (20190313), XP055568761 [I] 1-14 * the whole document * | [X] - anonymous, "Chocolate & Caramel Flavoured Ice Cream Cones", GNPD, MINTEL, (20181102), Database accession no. 6093739, URL: www.gnpd.com, XP055568635 [X] 9-12 * the whole document * | [X] - anonymous, "Oreo Ice Cream Dessert Cone", GNPD, MINTEL, (20181112), Database accession no. 6111721, URL: www.gnpd.com, XP055568628 [X] 9-12 * the whole document * | [X] - anonymous, "Salted Caramel Ice Cream Sandwich", GNPD, MINTEL, (20190103), Database accession no. 6230275, URL: www.gnpd.com, XP055568734 [X] 9-12 * the whole document * | [T] - anonymous, "Vanilla Flavoured Sugar", GNPD, MINTEL, (20060717), Database accession no. 558502, URL: www.gnpd.com, XP055676016 [T] * abstract * | [T] - Carola Enning, "Küchenlexikon Deutschland", (20200312), pages 1 - 2, URL: https://www.hausfrauenseite.de/kuechentipps/kuechenlexikon_deut.html, (20200312), XP055676020 | by applicant | US5306513 | - C. CLARKE, The Science of Ice Cream, RSC, (20040000), pages 54 - 59 | - KARL F. TIEFENBACHER, The technology of wafers and waffles I, Operational Aspects, Elsevier, (20170000), pages 499,506 - 507,512-520 |