Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP Patent family: EP3905925 Family dossiers alerts: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):  

CN202080007350 EP20702550 JP2021538255 KR20217024622 US201916239678 US2020012390W



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated





TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
KR102518114BGlobal Dossier 04.04.2023B1
KR20210126578 20.10.2021A
Priority number Date
US201916239678 04.01.2019
WO2020US12390 06.01.2020
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP7232917BGlobal Dossier 03.03.2023B2
JP2022516726 02.03.2022A
Priority number Date
US201916239678 04.01.2019
WO2020US12390 06.01.2020
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN113597269BGlobal Dossier 31.03.2023B
CN113597269 02.11.2021A
Priority number Date
US201916239678 04.01.2019
WO2020US12390 06.01.2020
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP3905925Global Dossier 12.07.2023B1
EP3905925 10.11.2021A1
Priority number Date
US201916239678 04.01.2019
WO2020US12390 06.01.2020
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO2020142774Global Dossier 09.07.2020A1
Priority number Date
US201916239678 04.01.2019
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
US10772410Global Dossier 15.09.2020B2
US2020214429 09.07.2020A1
Priority number Date
US201916239678 04.01.2019