EP3921302 - PROCESS FOR PURIFYING 4,4'-DICHLORODIPHENYL SULFOXIDE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.12.2023 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 30.12.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 11.09.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.11.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 14.08.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 11.02.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.02.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SI | published on 13.03.2024 [2024/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF SE Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67056 Ludwigshafen am Rhein / DE | [2023/05] |
Former [2021/50] | For all designated states BASF SE Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67056 Ludwigshafen am Rhein / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
THIEL, Indre Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | 02 /
SCHUETZ, Christian Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | 03 /
MELZER, Andreas Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | 04 /
BLEI, Stefan Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | [2023/05] |
Former [2021/50] | 01 /
THIEL, Indre 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | ||
02 /
SCHUETZ, Christian 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | |||
03 /
MELZER, Andreas 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | |||
04 /
BLEI, Stefan 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | Representative(s) | BASF IP Association BASF SE GBI-C006 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | [2023/05] |
Former [2021/50] | Kudla, Karsten, et al Patentanwälte Isenbruck Bösl Hörschler PartG mbB Eastsite One Seckenheimer Landstrasse 4 68163 Mannheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 20702658.4 | 06.02.2020 | [2021/50] | WO2020EP52966 | Priority number, date | EP20190156198 | 08.02.2019 Original published format: EP 19156198 | [2021/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020161225 | Date: | 13.08.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3921302 | Date: | 15.12.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.08.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3921302 | Date: | 01.02.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/05] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.08.2020 | Classification | IPC: | C07C315/06, C07C317/14 | [2021/50] | CPC: |
C07C317/14 (EP,KR);
C07C315/06 (EP,KR,US);
C07B2200/13 (KR)
| C-Set: |
C07C315/06, C07C317/14 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/50] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR REINIGUNG VON 4,4'-DICHLORDIPHENYL-SULFOXID | [2021/50] | English: | PROCESS FOR PURIFYING 4,4'-DICHLORODIPHENYL SULFOXIDE | [2021/50] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE PURIFICATION DE 4,4'-DICHLORODIPHÉNYL SULFOXYDE | [2022/37] |
Former [2021/50] | PROCÉDÉ DE PURIFICATION DE 4,4'-DICHLORODIPHÉNYLE SULFOXIDE | Entry into regional phase | 08.09.2021 | National basic fee paid | 08.09.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.09.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.09.2021 | Examination requested [2021/50] | 08.09.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 12.09.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.12.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 02.12.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 02.12.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 03.11.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 01.02.2023 | CZ | 01.02.2023 | DK | 01.02.2023 | EE | 01.02.2023 | ES | 01.02.2023 | FI | 01.02.2023 | HR | 01.02.2023 | LT | 01.02.2023 | LV | 01.02.2023 | MC | 01.02.2023 | PL | 01.02.2023 | RO | 01.02.2023 | RS | 01.02.2023 | SE | 01.02.2023 | SI | 01.02.2023 | SK | 01.02.2023 | SM | 01.02.2023 | IE | 06.02.2023 | LU | 06.02.2023 | NO | 01.05.2023 | GR | 02.05.2023 | IS | 01.06.2023 | PT | 01.06.2023 | [2024/11] |
Former [2024/08] | AT | 01.02.2023 | |
CZ | 01.02.2023 | ||
DK | 01.02.2023 | ||
EE | 01.02.2023 | ||
ES | 01.02.2023 | ||
FI | 01.02.2023 | ||
HR | 01.02.2023 | ||
LT | 01.02.2023 | ||
LV | 01.02.2023 | ||
MC | 01.02.2023 | ||
PL | 01.02.2023 | ||
RO | 01.02.2023 | ||
RS | 01.02.2023 | ||
SE | 01.02.2023 | ||
SK | 01.02.2023 | ||
SM | 01.02.2023 | ||
IE | 06.02.2023 | ||
LU | 06.02.2023 | ||
NO | 01.05.2023 | ||
GR | 02.05.2023 | ||
IS | 01.06.2023 | ||
PT | 01.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | AT | 01.02.2023 | |
CZ | 01.02.2023 | ||
DK | 01.02.2023 | ||
EE | 01.02.2023 | ||
ES | 01.02.2023 | ||
FI | 01.02.2023 | ||
HR | 01.02.2023 | ||
LT | 01.02.2023 | ||
LV | 01.02.2023 | ||
PL | 01.02.2023 | ||
RO | 01.02.2023 | ||
RS | 01.02.2023 | ||
SE | 01.02.2023 | ||
SK | 01.02.2023 | ||
SM | 01.02.2023 | ||
LU | 06.02.2023 | ||
NO | 01.05.2023 | ||
GR | 02.05.2023 | ||
IS | 01.06.2023 | ||
PT | 01.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/49] | AT | 01.02.2023 | |
CZ | 01.02.2023 | ||
DK | 01.02.2023 | ||
EE | 01.02.2023 | ||
ES | 01.02.2023 | ||
FI | 01.02.2023 | ||
HR | 01.02.2023 | ||
LT | 01.02.2023 | ||
LV | 01.02.2023 | ||
PL | 01.02.2023 | ||
RO | 01.02.2023 | ||
RS | 01.02.2023 | ||
SE | 01.02.2023 | ||
SM | 01.02.2023 | ||
LU | 06.02.2023 | ||
NO | 01.05.2023 | ||
GR | 02.05.2023 | ||
IS | 01.06.2023 | ||
PT | 01.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AT | 01.02.2023 | |
DK | 01.02.2023 | ||
EE | 01.02.2023 | ||
ES | 01.02.2023 | ||
FI | 01.02.2023 | ||
HR | 01.02.2023 | ||
LT | 01.02.2023 | ||
LV | 01.02.2023 | ||
PL | 01.02.2023 | ||
RS | 01.02.2023 | ||
SE | 01.02.2023 | ||
SM | 01.02.2023 | ||
NO | 01.05.2023 | ||
GR | 02.05.2023 | ||
IS | 01.06.2023 | ||
PT | 01.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | AT | 01.02.2023 | |
DK | 01.02.2023 | ||
ES | 01.02.2023 | ||
FI | 01.02.2023 | ||
HR | 01.02.2023 | ||
LT | 01.02.2023 | ||
LV | 01.02.2023 | ||
PL | 01.02.2023 | ||
RS | 01.02.2023 | ||
SE | 01.02.2023 | ||
SM | 01.02.2023 | ||
NO | 01.05.2023 | ||
GR | 02.05.2023 | ||
IS | 01.06.2023 | ||
PT | 01.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/39] | AT | 01.02.2023 | |
ES | 01.02.2023 | ||
FI | 01.02.2023 | ||
HR | 01.02.2023 | ||
LT | 01.02.2023 | ||
LV | 01.02.2023 | ||
PL | 01.02.2023 | ||
RS | 01.02.2023 | ||
SE | 01.02.2023 | ||
NO | 01.05.2023 | ||
GR | 02.05.2023 | ||
IS | 01.06.2023 | ||
PT | 01.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/38] | AT | 01.02.2023 | |
ES | 01.02.2023 | ||
FI | 01.02.2023 | ||
HR | 01.02.2023 | ||
LT | 01.02.2023 | ||
LV | 01.02.2023 | ||
PL | 01.02.2023 | ||
RS | 01.02.2023 | ||
SE | 01.02.2023 | ||
NO | 01.05.2023 | ||
GR | 02.05.2023 | ||
PT | 01.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AT | 01.02.2023 | |
ES | 01.02.2023 | ||
FI | 01.02.2023 | ||
HR | 01.02.2023 | ||
LT | 01.02.2023 | ||
LV | 01.02.2023 | ||
RS | 01.02.2023 | ||
SE | 01.02.2023 | ||
NO | 01.05.2023 | ||
GR | 02.05.2023 | ||
PT | 01.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/36] | AT | 01.02.2023 | |
ES | 01.02.2023 | ||
FI | 01.02.2023 | ||
HR | 01.02.2023 | ||
LT | 01.02.2023 | ||
LV | 01.02.2023 | ||
RS | 01.02.2023 | ||
SE | 01.02.2023 | ||
NO | 01.05.2023 | ||
PT | 01.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/35] | AT | 01.02.2023 | |
ES | 01.02.2023 | ||
HR | 01.02.2023 | ||
LT | 01.02.2023 | ||
RS | 01.02.2023 | ||
NO | 01.05.2023 | ||
PT | 01.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/34] | ES | 01.02.2023 | |
LT | 01.02.2023 | ||
RS | 01.02.2023 | ||
PT | 01.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/33] | ES | 01.02.2023 | |
LT | 01.02.2023 | Cited in | International search | [A]US4016210 (HORNER PATRICK JAMES, et al) [A] 1-10* See col. 8 *; | [AD]CN104402780 (SHANDONG KAISHENG NEW MATERIAL CO LTD) [AD] 1-10 * See claim 1 * | by applicant | SU765262 | CN102351756 | CN102351757 | CN102351758 | CN104402780 | CN104557626 | CN108047101 | - SUN, X. et al., "Investigations on the Lewis-acids-catalysed electrophilic aromatic substitution reactions of thionyl chloride and selenyl chloride, the substituent effect, and the reaction mechanisms", Journal of Chemical Research, (20130000), pages 736 - 744 | - SUN, X. et al., "Formation of diphenyl sulfoxide and diphenyl sulfide via the aluminum chloride-facilitated electrophilic aromatic substitution of benzene with thionyl chloride, and a novel reduction of sulfur(IV) to sulfur(II", Phosphorus, Sulfur, and Silicon, (20100000), vol. 185, pages 2535 - 2542 | - SUN, X. et al., "Iron(II) chloride (FeCi3)-cataiyzed electrophilic aromatic substitution of chlorobenzene with thionyl chloride (SOC12) and the accompanying auto-redox in sulfur to give diaryl sulfides (Ar S): Comparison to catalysis by aluminum chloride (AICI", Phosphorus, Sulfur, and Silicon, (20170000), vol. 192, no. 3, pages 376 - 380 |