Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP All documents: EP3921333 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP3921333



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 201
29.06.2023 Miscellaneous requests concerning client data Search / examination 1
28.06.2023 Request concerning the applicant/representative Search / examination 1
10.02.2022 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
10.02.2022 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 2
10.02.2022 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 3
10.02.2022 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 4
10.02.2022 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
17.11.2021 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
15.09.2021 Communication concerning correction of deficiencies in written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 3
08.09.2021 Priority search results copy provided by EPO Search / examination 7
30.08.2021 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
30.08.2021 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
23.08.2021 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 11
18.06.2021 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 4
31.08.2020 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 57
13.08.2020 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 4
13.08.2020 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 5
13.08.2020 Published international application - A1 Search / examination 35
01.05.2020 Notification relating to declaration under Rule 4.17 PCT (copy for ISA/EP) PCT receiving Office 1
21.04.2020 (Electronic) Receipt International Searching Authority 1
21.04.2020 Incoming letter related to ISA procedure International Searching Authority 2
21.04.2020 Reply to invitation to pay additional fees International Searching Authority 1
12.02.2020 Notification of the international application number and of the international filing date PCT receiving Office 6
07.02.2020 (Electronic) Receipt PCT receiving Office 2
07.02.2020 Abstract PCT receiving Office 1
07.02.2020 Claims PCT receiving Office 3
07.02.2020 Description PCT receiving Office 22
07.02.2020 Document concerning fees and payments PCT receiving Office 2
07.02.2020 Drawings PCT receiving Office 9
07.02.2020 Electronic request for grant of an International application PCT receiving Office 5