Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
29.01.2025 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
30.01.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
28.06.2023 | Change - representative | |
27.01.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
15.04.2022 | Change: Validation states | published on 18.05.2022 [2022/20] |
15.04.2022 | Change - extension states | published on 18.05.2022 [2022/20] |
11.02.2022 | Amendment by applicant | |
28.01.2022 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
24.01.2022 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
12.11.2021 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 15.12.2021 [2021/50] |
12.11.2021 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | |
12.11.2021 | Request for examination filed | published on 15.12.2021 [2021/50] |
19.10.2021 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
22.09.2021 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
31.08.2021 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
30.08.2021 | Change - representative | |
30.08.2021 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
14.08.2020 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
14.08.2020 | New entry: applicant or inventor | |
11.02.2020 | PCT data prior to European publication |