EP3921441 - A METHOD FOR DETERMINING THE SEVERITY OR GRADE OF HUMAN PAPILLOMAVIRUS (HPV)-INDUCED DYSPLASIA [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 06.06.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.11.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 14.08.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 11.02.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.06.2024 | First examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Charité - Universitätsmedizin Berlin Charitéplatz 1 10117 Berlin / DE | [2021/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KAUFMANN, Andreas Lörracherstraße 2a 12247 Berlin / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2021/50] | 01 /
KAUFMANN, Andreas 12247 Berlin / DE | Representative(s) | Hertin und Partner Rechts- und Patentanwälte PartG mbB Kurfürstendamm 54/55 10707 Berlin / DE | [2021/50] | Application number, filing date | 20702670.9 | 07.02.2020 | [2021/50] | WO2020EP53095 | Priority number, date | EP20190156203 | 08.02.2019 Original published format: EP 19156203 | [2021/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020161285 | Date: | 13.08.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3921441 | Date: | 15.12.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.08.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.08.2020 | Classification | IPC: | C12Q1/6886, C12Q1/70 | [2021/50] | CPC: |
C12Q1/6886 (EP,US);
C12Q1/708 (EP,US);
C12Q2600/112 (EP,US);
C12Q2600/158 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/50] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR BESTIMMUNG DES SCHWEREGRADES VON DURCH DAS HUMANE PAPILLOMAVIRUS (HPV) INDUZIERTER DYSPLASIE | [2021/50] | English: | A METHOD FOR DETERMINING THE SEVERITY OR GRADE OF HUMAN PAPILLOMAVIRUS (HPV)-INDUCED DYSPLASIA | [2021/50] | French: | PROCÉDÉ POUR DÉTERMINER LA GRAVITÉ OU LE DEGRÉ DE DYSPLASIE INDUITE PAR LE PAPILLOMAVIRUS HUMAIN (PVH) | [2021/50] | Entry into regional phase | 23.08.2021 | National basic fee paid | 23.08.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.08.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.08.2021 | Examination requested [2021/50] | 23.08.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 22.03.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.06.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP1369694 (MTM LAB AG [DE]); | [I]US2004202996 (WILLIAMS INNA R [US], et al); | [A]US2017204481 (RABBANI ELAZAR [US], et al); | by applicant | US2004202996 | US2017204481 |