Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP3923717
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
08.08.2024 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
08.08.2024 |
First examination report |
|
23.02.2024 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
27.11.2023 |
Change - representative |
|
20.02.2023 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
22.04.2022 |
Change: Validation states |
published on 25.05.2022 [2022/21] |
22.04.2022 |
Change - extension states |
published on 25.05.2022 [2022/21] |
14.03.2022 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
21.02.2022 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
24.01.2022 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
19.11.2021 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 22.12.2021 [2021/51] |
19.11.2021 |
The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established |
|
19.11.2021 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 22.12.2021 [2021/51] |
26.10.2021 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
01.07.2021 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
11.06.2021 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
29.05.2021 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
28.05.2021 |
Change - representative |
|
28.05.2021 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
22.08.2020 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
22.08.2020 |
New entry: applicant or inventor |
|
15.02.2020 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|