Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2022076141 | Global Dossier | 10.03.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | IT201900002249 | 15.02.2019 | WO2020IB50958 | 06.02.2020 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2020222279 | Global Dossier | 24.06.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | IT201900002249 | 15.02.2019 | WO2020IB50958 | 06.02.2020 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3923717 | Global Dossier | 22.12.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | IT201900002249 | 15.02.2019 | WO2020IB50958 | 06.02.2020 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR112021012064 | 19.10.2021 | A2 | Priority number | Date | IT201900002249 | 15.02.2019 | WO2020IB50958 | 06.02.2020 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2020165701 | Global Dossier | 20.08.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | IT201900002249 | 15.02.2019 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | IT201900002249 | 15.08.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | IT201900002249 | 15.02.2019 |