EP3923996 - CT CONTRAST AGENT FOR DETECTION OF CACHEXIA [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 05.08.2022 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.11.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 22.08.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 18.02.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.02.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Université de Genève 24 rue du Général-Dufour 1211 Genève / CH | For all designated states Adiposs SA c/o Fondation Genevoise pour l'Innovation Technologique FONGIT Route de la Galaise 34 1228 Plan-les-Ouates / CH | [2023/17] |
Former [2021/51] | For all designated states Université de Genève 24 rue du Général-Dufour 1211 Genève / CH | ||
For all designated states Adiposs Sàrl Route de la Galaise 34 C/o FONGIT 1228 Plan-les-Ouates / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BABIC, Andrej 160, Chemin des Pommiers 74140 Veigy-Foncenex / FR | 02 /
STRANSKY-HEILKRON, Nathalie 43 rue Buffon Bellegarde-sur-Valserine 01200 Valserhône / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2021/51] | 01 /
BABIC, Andrej 74140 Veigy-Foncenex / FR | ||
02 /
STRANSKY-HEILKRON, Nathalie 01200 Valserhône / FR | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2021/51] | Application number, filing date | 20703771.4 | 13.02.2020 | [2021/51] | WO2020EP53768 | Priority number, date | EP20190157026 | 13.02.2019 Original published format: EP 19157026 | [2021/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020165349 | Date: | 20.08.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3923996 | Date: | 22.12.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.08.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.08.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A61K49/04 | [2021/51] | CPC: |
A61K49/0438 (EP,CN,IL,KR,US);
A61K49/0461 (EP,CN,IL,KR,US);
A61K49/0495 (EP,CN,IL,KR,US);
G01N2800/044 (IL);
G01N2800/7028 (IL);
G01N2800/7085 (IL)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/51] | Title | German: | CT-KONTRASTMITTEL ZUR DETEKTION VON KACHEXIE | [2021/51] | English: | CT CONTRAST AGENT FOR DETECTION OF CACHEXIA | [2021/51] | French: | AGENT DE CONTRASTE CT POUR LA DÉTECTION DE LA CACHEXIE | [2021/51] | Entry into regional phase | 07.09.2021 | National basic fee paid | 07.09.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.09.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.12.2020 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 07.09.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.09.2021 | Examination requested [2021/51] | 07.09.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 08.08.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.12.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XP]WO2019030024 (UNIV GENEVE [CH]); |