EP3887996 - A SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR OPTIMIZING PHYSICAL CHARACTERISTICS OF AN ELECTROMAGNETIC DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.09.2021 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 18.07.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 19.02.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.01.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states X Development LLC 1600 Amphitheatre Parkway Mountain View, CA 94043 / US | [2021/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LU, Jesse 1600 Amphitheatre Parkway Mountain View, California 94043 / US | 02 /
SCHUBERT, Martin 1600 Amphitheatre Parkway Mountain View, California 94043 / US | 03 /
ADOLF, Brian 1600 Amphitheatre Parkway Mountain View, California 94043 / US | [2021/40] | Representative(s) | Derry, Paul Stefan, et al Venner Shipley LLP 200 Aldersgate London EC1A 4HD / GB | [2021/40] | Application number, filing date | 20704126.0 | 08.01.2020 | [2021/40] | WO2020US12780 | Priority number, date | US201916244846 | 10.01.2019 Original published format: US201916244846 | [2021/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020146526 | Date: | 16.07.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3887996 | Date: | 06.10.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.07.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.07.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G06F30/20, G06F30/23, G02B6/10, G02B27/00, G02B6/02 | [2021/40] | CPC: |
G06F30/20 (EP);
G06F30/00 (US);
G02B27/0012 (EP);
G06F30/23 (EP,US);
G02B2006/02166 (EP);
G02B6/10 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/40] | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR OPTIMIERUNG DER PHYSIKALISCHEN EIGENSCHAFTEN EINER ELEKTROMAGNETISCHEN VORRICHTUNG | [2021/40] | English: | A SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR OPTIMIZING PHYSICAL CHARACTERISTICS OF AN ELECTROMAGNETIC DEVICE | [2021/40] | French: | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ POUR OPTIMISER LES CARACTÉRISTIQUES PHYSIQUES D'UN DISPOSITIF ÉLECTROMAGNÉTIQUE | [2021/40] | Entry into regional phase | 28.06.2021 | National basic fee paid | 28.06.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.06.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.06.2021 | Examination requested [2021/40] | 28.06.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 24.12.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2002165682 (DOERR CHRISTOPHER RICHARD [US]) [A] 1-23 * abstract * * paragraph [0002] - paragraph [0004] * * paragraph [0009] - paragraph [0012] * * paragraph [0024] ** paragraph [0028] *; | [I]US2018045953 (FAN JONATHAN A [US], et al) [I] 1-23 * abstract * * paragraph [0005] - paragraph [0006] * * paragraph [0078] * * paragraph [0084] * * paragraph [0085] - paragraph [0086] * * paragraph [0202] - paragraph [0203] * * paragraph [0214] - paragraph [0215] * * paragraph [0232] - paragraph [0233] * * paragraph [0270] *; | [I] - IGUCHI AKITO ET AL, "Topology Optimization of Optical Waveguide Devices Based on Beam Propagation Method With Sensitivity Analysis", JOURNAL OF LIGHTWAVE TECHNOLOGY, IEEE, USA, vol. 34, no. 18, doi:10.1109/JLT.2016.2597308, ISSN 0733-8724, (20160915), pages 4214 - 4220, (20160902), XP011621612 [I] 1-23 * abstract * * page 4214, column 1, paragraph l * * figures 3,4 * * page 4216, column 1, paragraph l * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/JLT.2016.2597308 | [I] - SAWADA YUSUKE ET AL, "Development of the Wavefront Matching Method Based on the 3-D Finite-Element Method and Its Application to Si-wire Mode Converters", JOURNAL OF LIGHTWAVE TECHNOLOGY, IEEE, USA, vol. 36, no. 17, doi:10.1109/JLT.2018.2843383, ISSN 0733-8724, (20180901), pages 3652 - 3659, (20180711), XP011686848 [I] 1-23 * abstract * * page 3652, column 2, paragraph 2 * * page 3653, column 2, paragraph 2; figure 1 * * page 3654, column 1, paragraph 2 - column 2, paragraph 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/JLT.2018.2843383 |