EP3884519 - COOLING OF AN ELECTRONIC COMPONENT BY FORCED CONVECTION AND METHOD FOR COOLING AN ELECTRONIC ASSEMBLY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2021/39] | DISSIPATING HEAT FROM AN ELECTRONIC ASSEMBLY USING FORCED CONVECTION, AND METHOD FOR DISSIPATING HEAT FROM AN ELECTRONIC ASSEMBLY | ||
[2022/29] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 14.10.2022 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.08.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 14.08.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 24.02.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.01.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Werner-von-Siemens-Straße 1 80333 München / DE | [2021/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DIEPOLD, Fabian Am Limes 20 93336 Altmannstein / DE | 02 /
KIESEL, Alexander Schillerstraße 17 91054 Erlangen / DE | 03 /
WEIS, Benno Amselstraße 8 91334 Hemhofen / DE | 04 /
FÜRST, Johannes Hagenhausener Str. 8 92348 Stöckelsberg / DE | [2021/39] | Representative(s) | Siemens Patent Attorneys Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | [N/P] | Application number, filing date | 20704425.6 | 29.01.2020 | [2021/39] | WO2020EP52168 | Priority number, date | EP20190155237 | 04.02.2019 Original published format: EP 19155237 | [2021/39] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020160978 | Date: | 13.08.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3884519 | Date: | 29.09.2021 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.08.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.08.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H01L23/367, H01L23/467, H05K1/02 | [2021/39] | CPC: |
H01L23/467 (EP);
H05K1/0206 (US);
H01L23/3677 (EP);
H05K1/181 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/39] | Title | German: | ENTWÄRMUNG EINER ELEKTRONISCHEN BAUGRUPPE MITTELS FORCIERTER KONVEKTION, SOWIE VERFAHREN ZUM ENTWÄRMEN EINER ELEKTRONISCHEN BAUGRUPPE | [2021/39] | English: | COOLING OF AN ELECTRONIC COMPONENT BY FORCED CONVECTION AND METHOD FOR COOLING AN ELECTRONIC ASSEMBLY | [2022/33] | French: | DISSIPATION THERMIQUE D'UN MODULE ÉLECTRONIQUE PAR CONVECTION FORCÉE AINSI QUE PROCÉDÉ DE DISSIPATION THERMIQUE D'UN MODULE ÉLECTRONIQUE | [2022/29] |
Former [2021/39] | DISSIPATING HEAT FROM AN ELECTRONIC ASSEMBLY USING FORCED CONVECTION, AND METHOD FOR DISSIPATING HEAT FROM AN ELECTRONIC ASSEMBLY | ||
Former [2021/39] | DISSIPATION DE LA CHALEUR D'UN BLOC ÉLECTRONIQUE PAR CONVECTION FORCÉE, ET PROCÉDÉ POUR DISSIPER LA CHALEUR D'UN BLOC ÉLECTRONIQUE | Entry into regional phase | 23.06.2021 | National basic fee paid | 23.06.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.06.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.12.2020 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 23.06.2021 | Examination requested [2021/39] | 23.06.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 17.01.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.10.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.04.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]DE19910500 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [Y] 1-12 * abstract * * figure 1 * * column 2, line 55 - column 4, line 44 * * claims 1-7 *; | [A]DE102014205411 (ZAHNRADFABRIK FRIEDRICHSHAFEN [DE]) [A] 1-12 * abstract * * figure 2 ** paragraph [0034] *; | [Y]US2018310396 (KOBAYASHI RYO [JP], et al) [Y] 1-12 * abstract * * figures 4-6 * * paragraphs [0053] - [0065] * | by applicant | US2006006525 | US2018310396 |