Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2023383408 | Global Dossier | 30.11.2023 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US202318447603 | 10.08.2023 | DE102019104433 | 21.02.2019 | WO2020EP53289 | 10.02.2020 | US202117310750 | 20.08.2021 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2022106687 | Global Dossier | 07.04.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102019104433 | 21.02.2019 | WO2020EP53289 | 10.02.2020 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20210128461 | Global Dossier | 26.10.2021 | A | Priority number | Date | DE102019104433 | 21.02.2019 | WO2020EP53289 | 10.02.2020 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP7475357B | Global Dossier | 26.04.2024 | B2 | JP2022521176 | 06.04.2022 | A | Priority number | Date | DE102019104433 | 21.02.2019 | WO2020EP53289 | 10.02.2020 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP4328352 | Global Dossier | 10.07.2024 | A3 | EP4328352 | 28.02.2024 | A2 | Priority number | Date | DE102019104433 | 21.02.2019 | WO2020EP53289 | 10.02.2020 | EP20704519 | 10.02.2020 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN113454264 | Global Dossier | 28.09.2021 | A | Priority number | Date | DE102019104433 | 21.02.2019 | WO2020EP53289 | 10.02.2020 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3928349 | Global Dossier | 20.03.2024 | C0 | EP3928349 | Global Dossier | 20.03.2024 | B1 | EP3928349 | 29.12.2021 | A2 | Priority number | Date | DE102019104433 | 21.02.2019 | WO2020EP53289 | 10.02.2020 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2020169385 | Global Dossier | 18.03.2021 | A3 | WO2020169385 | 27.08.2020 | A2 | Priority number | Date | DE102019104433 | 21.02.2019 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE102019104433 | 27.08.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102019104433 | 21.02.2019 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | TW202035784 | 01.10.2020 | A | Priority number | Date | DE102019104433 | 21.02.2019 | Type | Divisional application | EP4328352 |