EP3908098 - AGRICULTURAL HEADER WITH DEBRIS REMOVAL SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 19.04.2024 Database last updated on 03.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 14.12.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.10.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 18.07.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 24.02.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.04.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 22.05.2024 [2024/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CNH Industrial Belgium NV Leon Claeysstraat 3A 8210 Zedelgem / BE | [2021/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KEMMERER, Benjamin D. 33 Perry Lane Hamburg, Pennsylvania 19256 / US | 02 /
NOLL, Blaine R. 4 Daisy Lane Fleetwood, Pennsylvania 19522 / US | 03 /
DEICHMANN, Scott P. 312 Locust Drive Phoenixville, Pennsylvania 19460 / US | [2024/21] |
Former [2021/46] | 01 /
KEMMERER, Benjamin D. Hamburg, Pennsylvania 19256 / US | ||
02 /
NOLL, Blaine R. Fleetwood, Pennsylvania 19522 / US | |||
03 /
DEICHMANN, Scott P. Phoenixville, Pennsylvania 19460 / US | Representative(s) | CNH Industrial IP Department Leon Claeysstraat 3A 8210 Zedelgem / BE | [2024/21] |
Former [2021/46] | CNH Industrial IP Department Patent Department Leon Claeysstraat 3A 8210 Zedelgem / BE | Application number, filing date | 20704650.9 | 09.01.2020 | [2021/46] | WO2020US12893 | Priority number, date | US201962790164P | 09.01.2019 Original published format: US 201962790164 P | [2021/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020146604 | Date: | 16.07.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3908098 | Date: | 17.11.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.07.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3908098 | Date: | 22.05.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.07.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A01D41/14, A01D57/20, A01D61/00 | [2021/46] | CPC: |
A01D41/14 (EP,US);
A01D34/40 (US);
A01D34/04 (US);
A01D34/14 (US);
A01D57/20 (EP,US);
A01D61/002 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/46] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | LANDWIRTSCHAFTLICHER ERNTEVORSATZ MIT SCHMUTZENTFERNUNGSSYSTEM | [2024/01] | English: | AGRICULTURAL HEADER WITH DEBRIS REMOVAL SYSTEM | [2021/46] | French: | TÊTE DE RÉCOLTE AGRICOLE AVEC SYSTÈME D'ÉLIMINATION DE DÉBRIS | [2024/01] |
Former [2021/46] | LANDWIRTSCHAFTLICHE MASCHINE MIT ABLAGERUNGSENTFERNUNGSSYSTEM | ||
Former [2021/46] | TABLE DE COUPE AGRICOLE AVEC SYSTÈME D'ÉLIMINATION DE DÉBRIS | Entry into regional phase | 09.08.2021 | National basic fee paid | 09.08.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.08.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.08.2021 | Examination requested [2021/46] | 09.08.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 18.02.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.12.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.04.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 15.04.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 15.04.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]DE102004024232 (DEERE & CO [US]) [A] 1-20 * paragraphs [0025] - [0034] - [0052]; figures 1-7 *; | [A]US7937920 (SCHMIDT JAMES R [US], et al) [A] 1-12* column 2, line 34 - column 5, line 35; figures 1-7 *; | [A]US8479483 (HUSEMAN MICHAEL [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * column 2, lines 5-61 * * column 3, line 16 - column 7, line 33; figures 6-9 *; | [A]US2018139899 (SHEARER BRUCE ROBERT [CA]) [A] 1-20 * paragraphs [0139] - [0145] - [0152]; figures 1-6 * |