EP3909354 - DISTANCE BASED RESOURCE EXCLUSION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 15.12.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.10.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 18.07.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 24.02.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.04.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states QUALCOMM Incorporated 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US | [2021/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NGUYEN, Tien Viet 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | 02 /
BAGHEL, Sudhir, Kumar 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | 03 /
GULATI, Kapil 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | 04 /
BHARADWAJ, Arjun 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | 05 /
WU, Shuanshuan 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2021/46] | 01 /
NGUYEN, Tien Viet San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | ||
02 /
BAGHEL, Sudhir, Kumar San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | |||
03 /
GULATI, Kapil San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | |||
04 /
BHARADWAJ, Arjun San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | |||
05 /
WU, Shuanshuan San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | Representative(s) | Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Prinzregentenplatz 7 81675 München / DE | [2021/46] | Application number, filing date | 20704677.2 | 10.01.2020 | [2021/46] | WO2020US13230 | Priority number, date | US201962791029P | 11.01.2019 Original published format: US 201962791029 P | US202016739005 | 09.01.2020 Original published format: US202016739005 | [2021/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020146834 | Date: | 16.07.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3909354 | Date: | 17.11.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.07.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.07.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H04W72/04 | [2021/46] | CPC: |
H04W72/51 (EP,US);
H04W64/00 (US);
H04W72/02 (EP,US);
H04W72/20 (EP,US);
H04W72/52 (US);
H04W72/543 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/46] | Title | German: | ABSTANDSBASIERTER RESSOURCENAUSSCHLUSS | [2021/46] | English: | DISTANCE BASED RESOURCE EXCLUSION | [2021/46] | French: | EXCLUSION DE RESSOURCES BASÉE SUR LA DISTANCE | [2021/46] | Entry into regional phase | 15.06.2021 | National basic fee paid | 15.06.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.06.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.06.2021 | Examination requested [2021/46] | 15.06.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 24.02.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.12.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.04.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |