EP3927658 - BLEACHING TOWER AND METHOD FOR NITRIC ACID PRODUCTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.04.2024 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 05.05.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 20.09.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.11.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 28.08.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 24.02.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.04.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 15.05.2024 [2024/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Yara International ASA Drammensveien 131 0277 Oslo / NO | [2021/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ØIEN, Halvor Hvalenvegen 58 3493 Porsgrunn / NO | 02 /
MELGÅRD, Arnulf Idar Lergravstrand 1A 3740 Skien / NO | [2023/23] |
Former [2021/52] | 01 /
ØIEN, Halvor 3493 Porsgrunn / NO | ||
02 /
MELGÅRD, Arnulf Idar 3740 Skien / NO | Representative(s) | AWA Sweden AB P.O. Box 11394 404 28 Göteborg / SE | [2021/52] | Application number, filing date | 20704875.2 | 14.02.2020 | [2021/52] | WO2020EP53863 | Priority number, date | EP20190158885 | 22.02.2019 Original published format: EP 19158885 | [2021/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020169465 | Date: | 27.08.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3927658 | Date: | 29.12.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.08.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3927658 | Date: | 07.06.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.08.2020 | Classification | IPC: | C01B21/46, C01B21/40, B01D53/18 | [2021/52] | CPC: |
C01B21/46 (EP);
C01B21/40 (EP,US);
B01D53/1418 (US);
B01D53/185 (EP,US);
B01D2257/40 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/52] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BLEICHTURM UND VERFAHREN ZUR SALPETERSÄUREHERSTELLUNG | [2022/34] | English: | BLEACHING TOWER AND METHOD FOR NITRIC ACID PRODUCTION | [2021/52] | French: | TOUR DE BLANCHIMENT ET PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION D'ACIDE NITRIQUE | [2021/52] |
Former [2021/52] | BLEICHTURM UND -VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON SALPETERSÄURE | Entry into regional phase | 20.09.2021 | National basic fee paid | 20.09.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.09.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.09.2020 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 20.09.2021 | Examination requested [2021/52] | 20.09.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 21.09.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.01.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 26.01.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 26.01.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 08.03.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 07.06.2023 | HR | 07.06.2023 | RO | 07.06.2023 | RS | 07.06.2023 | SK | 07.06.2023 | SM | 07.06.2023 | NO | 07.09.2023 | GR | 08.09.2023 | IS | 07.10.2023 | [2024/10] |
Former [2024/08] | HR | 07.06.2023 | |
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
SK | 07.06.2023 | ||
SM | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | HR | 07.06.2023 | |
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | NO | 07.09.2023 | |
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | NO | 07.09.2023 | Cited in | International search | [AD]US3579298 (O'BRIEN GEORGE, et al) [AD] 1-12 * column 7, line 44 - column 8, line 16; figure 2 *; | [IDA]DE4035205 (CURTIUS FRITZ [DE]) [ID] 1-4 * figure - * * column 2, line 53 - line 61 * * column 5, line 43 - column 6, line 60 * [A] 5-12; | [IDA]DE4034752 (CURTIUS FRITZ [DE]) [ID] 1-4 * column 2, line 63 - column 4, line 19 * [A] 5-12; | [IDA]WO02083260 (KOCH GLITSCH LP [US]) [ID] 1-4 * figure - * [A] 5-12; | [IDA]EP2295375 (DIETRICH PROCESS SYSTEMS GMBH DE [DE]) [ID] 1-4 * paragraphs [0032] , [0047] , [0051] , [0062] , [0063] , [0 70] , [0074]; figure 2 * [A] 5-12; | [T] - Anonymous, "CORE-TRAY COLUMN INTERNALS", (20180327), pages 1 - 2, URL: http://info.ddpsinc.com/hs-fs/hub/47823/file-1025317049-pdf/PDF_Files/S1.301_-_Core_Tray.pdf, (20190801), XP055610385 [T] 3 * the whole document * | [T] - Anonymous, "SEPARATION TECHNOLOGY Unit operations Processes Services", (20000101), pages 1 - 12, URL: http://rcprocess.se/bdh_filearea/Sulzer_Kuhni/Separation_Tech.pdf, (20190802), XP055610615 [T] 1-12 * "Distillation, Absorption"; page 4 - page 5 * | by applicant | US4816191 | DE4035205 | DE4034752 | WO02083260 | EP2295375 |