EP3928501 - METHOD FOR MANAGING THE ACCESS OF A USER TO A VOICE SERVICE, CORRESPONDING DEVICE, SYSTEM AND PROGRAMS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 21.04.2023 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.11.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 28.08.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 24.02.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.01.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Banks and Acquirers International Holding 28-32 boulevard de Grenelle 75015 Paris / FR | [2021/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DUBREUIL, Arnaud 23 avenue de Lamballe 75016 PARIS / FR | 02 /
D'AVOUT, Quitterie 108 rue de la Folie Méricourt 75011 PARIS / FR | 03 /
QUENTIN, Pierre 26 rue Paul Delinge 95880 ENGHIEN LES BAINS / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2021/52] | 01 /
DUBREUIL, Arnaud 75016 PARIS / FR | ||
02 /
D'AVOUT, Quitterie 75011 PARIS / FR | |||
03 /
QUENTIN, Pierre 95880 ENGHIEN LES BAINS / FR | Representative(s) | Germain Maureau 12, rue Boileau 69006 Lyon / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2021/52] | Vidon Brevets & Stratégie 16B, rue de Jouanet BP 90333 35703 Rennes Cedex 7 / FR | Application number, filing date | 20704917.2 | 20.02.2020 | [2021/52] | WO2020EP54500 | Priority number, date | FR20190001811 | 22.02.2019 Original published format: FR 1901811 | [2021/52] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020169741 | Date: | 27.08.2020 | Language: | FR | [2020/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3928501 | Date: | 29.12.2021 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.08.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.08.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H04M3/493, G06Q30/00, G10L15/26, G10L17/00, H04W12/06, G06F21/32 | [2021/52] | CPC: |
H04L63/0861 (EP);
G10L17/04 (US);
G06Q20/40145 (US);
G06Q30/0185 (EP);
G10L17/02 (US);
G10L17/06 (US);
G10L17/24 (US);
H04M3/42153 (EP,US);
G06F21/32 (EP);
G10L15/26 (EP);
G10L17/00 (EP);
H04M2201/41 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/52] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR VERWALTUNG DES ZUGANGS EINES BENUTZERS ZU EINEM SPRACHDIENST, ENTSPRECHENDE VORRICHTUNG, SYSTEM UND PROGRAMME | [2021/52] | English: | METHOD FOR MANAGING THE ACCESS OF A USER TO A VOICE SERVICE, CORRESPONDING DEVICE, SYSTEM AND PROGRAMS | [2021/52] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE GESTION D'ACCÈS D'UN UTILISATEUR À UN SERVICE VOCAL, DISPOSITIF, SYSTÈME ET PROGRAMMES CORRESPONDANTS | [2021/52] | Entry into regional phase | 05.08.2021 | National basic fee paid | 05.08.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.08.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.08.2021 | Examination requested [2021/52] | 05.08.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 29.03.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.04.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.10.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [I]US2002004831 (WOODHILL JAMES R [US]) [I] 1,5,6 * page 11; table IV ** paragraph [0046] *; | [A]US7227930 (OTHMER KONSTANTIN [US], et al) [A] 1,6 * column 17, lines 8-51 * * column 18, lines 1-11,64-67 * * column 4, lines 1-3,23-25,38-56 * * column 19, lines 8-13 *; | [XI]US2016254000 (THALANANY KEVIN THOMAS [US]) [X] 5 * paragraphs [0028] - [0039] - [0042] , [0047] - [0058]; figures 4,5 * [I] 1-4,6 |