EP3925137 - RANDOM ACCESS PROCEDURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.10.2022 Database last updated on 03.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 03.02.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.11.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 22.08.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 24.02.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.10.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.11.2022 [2022/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TELEFONAKTIEBOLAGET LM ERICSSON (PUBL) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | [2021/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHREEVASTAV, Ritesh Jordbrukargatan 41 194 47 Upplands Väsby / SE | 02 /
ÅSTRÖM, Magnus Guldåkersvägen 12 224 80 LUND / SE | 03 /
KAZMI, Muhammad Skrivargatan 7 174 64 SUNDBYBERG / SE | 04 /
THANGARASA, Santhan Korgvidegränd 24 162 44 VÄLLINGBY / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2021/51] | 01 /
SHREEVASTAV, Ritesh 194 47 Upplands Väsby / SE | ||
02 /
ÅSTRÖM, Magnus 224 80 LUND / SE | |||
03 /
KAZMI, Muhammad 174 64 SUNDBYBERG / SE | |||
04 /
THANGARASA, Santhan 162 44 VÄLLINGBY / SE | Representative(s) | Ericsson Patent Development Torshamnsgatan 21-23 164 80 Stockholm / SE | [2021/51] | Application number, filing date | 20704959.4 | 30.01.2020 | [2021/51] | WO2020SE50076 | Priority number, date | US201962805482P | 14.02.2019 Original published format: US 201962805482 P | [2021/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2020167202 | Date: | 20.08.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/34] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3925137 | Date: | 22.12.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.08.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.09.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H04L5/00, H04B17/00 | [2021/51] | CPC: |
H04L5/0053 (EP,CN,KR);
H04L5/0048 (KR);
H04W74/0833 (CN,KR);
H04W74/0841 (US);
H04B17/318 (KR);
H04L5/0007 (EP,CN,KR);
H04L5/0041 (EP,CN,KR);
H04L5/0051 (US);
H04L5/006 (EP,KR);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/51] | Title | German: | DIREKTZUGRIFFSVERFAHREN | [2021/51] | English: | RANDOM ACCESS PROCEDURE | [2021/51] | French: | PROCÉDURE D'ACCÈS ALÉATOIRE | [2021/51] | Entry into regional phase | 27.06.2021 | National basic fee paid | 27.06.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.06.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.11.2020 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 27.06.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.06.2021 | Examination requested [2021/51] | 27.06.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 04.02.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.06.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2022/47] | 04.07.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2022/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XAI]EP3419340 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [X] 20,21,23,26,29,30 * figure 12 * * paragraph [0127] - paragraph [0137] * * paragraph [0155] * [A] 22 [I] 24,25; | [IA] - HUAWEI ET AL, "Determining starting PRACH resource set", vol. RAN WG1, no. Beijing, China; 20150824 - 20150828, (20150815), 3GPP DRAFT; R1-154603, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg_ran/WG1_RL1/TSGR1_82/Docs/, (20150815), XP050993397 [I] 1,2,14-21,23-28 * page 1 - page 3 * [A] 3-13,22 | [XAI] - ZTE, "Physical Random Access Channel Coverage Enhancement", vol. RAN WG1, no. Barcelona, Spain; 20130819 - 20130823, (20130810), 3GPP DRAFT; R1-133063, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg_ran/WG1_RL1/TSGR1_74/Docs/, (20130810), XP050716290 [X] 1,14-17,27,28 * page 2 * [A] 3-13 [I] 2,18-21,23-26 | [IP] - ERICSSON, "Use case and Signaling for RSS", vol. RAN WG2, no. Chongqing, P.R. China; 20191014 - 20191018, (20191004), 3GPP DRAFT; R2-1913408 - USE CASE AND SIGNALING FOR RSS, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: https://ftp.3gpp.org/tsg_ran/WG2_RL2/TSGR2_107bis/Docs/R2-1913408.zip, (20191004), XP051804985 [IP] 1-30 * the whole document * |