EP3925357 - CONTROL SIGNALLING FOR TRANSMISSION IN UNLICENSED FREQUENCY SPECTRUM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.02.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.11.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 22.08.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 28.02.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.06.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | [2021/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WANG, Min Granitstigen 27 977 53 LULEÅ / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2021/51] | 01 /
WANG, Min 977 53 LULEÅ / SE | Representative(s) | Zacco Sweden AB P.O. Box 5581 Löjtnantsgatan 21 114 85 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2021/51] | Ericsson Patent Development Torshamnsgatan 21-23 164 80 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 20705333.1 | 12.02.2020 | [2021/51] | WO2020EP53524 | Priority number, date | US201962804398P | 12.02.2019 Original published format: US 201962804398 P | [2021/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020165200 | Date: | 20.08.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3925357 | Date: | 22.12.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.08.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.08.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H04W72/12, H04W16/14, H04W74/08 | [2021/51] | CPC: |
H04W72/20 (EP);
H04W74/0816 (US);
H04W16/14 (EP,US);
H04W72/0446 (US);
H04W72/1263 (US);
H04W72/23 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/51] | Title | German: | STEUERUNGSSIGNALISIERUNG ZUR ÜBERTRAGUNG IM UNLIZENZIERTEN FREQUENZSPEKTRUM | [2021/51] | English: | CONTROL SIGNALLING FOR TRANSMISSION IN UNLICENSED FREQUENCY SPECTRUM | [2021/51] | French: | SIGNALISATION DE COMMANDE DESTINÉE À UNE TRANSMISSION DANS UN SPECTRE DE FRÉQUENCE NON AUTORISÉ | [2021/51] | Entry into regional phase | 03.09.2021 | National basic fee paid | 03.09.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.09.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.09.2021 | Examination requested [2021/51] | 03.09.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 21.03.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.02.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.06.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XYI] - ERICSSON, "DL signals and channels for NR-U", vol. RAN WG1, no. Taipei, Taiwan; 20190121 - 20190125, (20190120), 3GPP DRAFT; R1-1900996 DL SIGNALS AND CHANNELS, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/Meetings%5F3GPP%5FSYNC/RAN1/Docs/R1%2D1900996%2Ezip, (20190120), XP051593841 [X] 1-6,8,12-16,18,22-32 * the whole document * [Y] 10,11,20,21 [I] 7,9,17,19 | [XA] - VIVO, "Feature lead summary for Configured grant enhancement", vol. RAN WG1, no. Taipei; 20190121 - 20190125, (20190124), 3GPP DRAFT; R1-1901441 SUMMARY ON 7.2.2.2.4 CONFIGURED GRANT ENHANCEMENTS-, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CED, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg%5Fran/WG1%5FRL1/TSGR1%5FAH/NR%5FAH%5F1901/Docs/R1%2D1901441%2Ezip, (20190124), XP051601353 [X] 12,24,27,31 * pages 8-9, 4 COT sharing * [A] 1-11,13-23,25,26,28-30,32 | [YA] - INTEL CORPORATION, "Enhancements to configured grants for NR-unlicensed", vol. RAN WG1, no. Taipei, Taiwan; 20190121 - 20190125, (20190120), 3GPP DRAFT; R1-1900473 - INTEL NR-U CONFIGURED GRANTS, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/Meetings%5F3GPP%5FSYNC/RAN1/Docs/R1%2D1900473%2Ezip, (20190120), XP051593386 [Y] 10,11,20,21 * pages 3-6,2 Grant-free UL Transmission via configured grant Mechanism * [A] 1-9,12-19,22-32 |