EP3911410 - METHODS AND SYSTEMS FOR PRODUCING AAV PARTICLES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.10.2021 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.07.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 28.02.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.01.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Voyager Therapeutics, Inc. 75 Sidney Street Cambridge, Massachusetts 02139 / US | [2021/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MARANGA, Luis c/o Voyager Therapeutics, Inc. 75 Sidney Street Cambridge, Massachusetts 02139 / US | 02 /
MORRISON, Christopher J. c/o Voyager Therapeutics, Inc. 75 Sidney Street Cambridge, Massachusetts 02139 / US | 03 /
MATHUR, Krishanu c/o Voyager Therapeutics, Inc. 75 Sidney Street Cambridge, Massachusetts 02139 / US | 04 /
LUTHER, Matthew c/o Voyager Therapeutics, Inc. 75 Sidney Street Cambridge, Massachusetts 02139 / US | 05 /
HURWIT, Daniel S. c/o Voyager Therapeutics, Inc. 75 Sidney Street Cambridge, Massachusetts 02139 / US | 06 /
CARDINAL, Jacob J. c/o Voyager Therapeutics, Inc. 75 Sidney Street Cambridge, Massachusetts 02139 / US | 07 /
KARPES, Lori B. 32 Roberts Road Ashland, Massachusetts 01721 / US | 08 /
ANSONDARIA, Aditya c/o Voyager Therapeutics, Inc. 75 Sidney Street Cambridge, Massachusetts 02139 / US | 09 /
FORSTER, James c/o Voyager Therapeutics, Inc. 75 Sidney Street Cambridge, Massachusetts 02139 / US | 10 /
DISMUKE, David 414 Selwood Place Cary, North Carolina 27519 / US | 11 /
STEININGER, Robert 100 Reed Street Cambridge, Massachusetts 02140 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2021/47] | 01 /
MARANGA, Luis Cambridge, Massachusetts 02139 / US | ||
02 /
MORRISON, Christopher J. Cambridge, Massachusetts 02139 / US | |||
03 /
MATHUR, Krishanu Cambridge, Massachusetts 02139 / US | |||
04 /
LUTHER, Matthew Cambridge, Massachusetts 02139 / US | |||
05 /
HURWIT, Daniel S. Cambridge, Massachusetts 02139 / US | |||
06 /
CARDINAL, Jacob J. Cambridge, Massachusetts 02139 / US | |||
07 /
KARPES, Lori B. Ashland, Massachusetts 01721 / US | |||
08 /
ANSONDARIA, Aditya Cambridge, Massachusetts 02139 / US | |||
09 /
FORSTER, James Cambridge, Massachusetts 02139 / US | |||
10 /
DISMUKE, David Cary, North Carolina 27519 / US | |||
11 /
STEININGER, Robert Cambridge, Massachusetts 02140 / US | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2021/47] | Application number, filing date | 20705569.0 | 17.01.2020 | [2021/47] | WO2020US14000 | Priority number, date | US201962794199P | 18.01.2019 Original published format: US 201962794199 P | US201962794204P | 18.01.2019 Original published format: US 201962794204 P | US201962794208P | 18.01.2019 Original published format: US 201962794208 P | US201962794216P | 18.01.2019 Original published format: US 201962794216 P | US201962931848P | 07.11.2019 Original published format: US 201962931848 P | [2021/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020150556 | Date: | 23.07.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3911410 | Date: | 24.11.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.07.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.07.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A61P25/14, C12N15/86 | [2021/47] | CPC: |
A61P25/14 (EP,IL);
C12N15/86 (EP,IL,US);
A61K48/005 (US);
C12N2710/14052 (EP);
C12N2750/14143 (EP,US);
C12N2750/14151 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/47] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND SYSTEME ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON AAV-PARTIKELN | [2021/47] | English: | METHODS AND SYSTEMS FOR PRODUCING AAV PARTICLES | [2021/47] | French: | PROCÉDÉS ET SYSTÈMES DE FABRICATION DE PARTICULES AAV | [2021/47] | Biological material | This application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details | Entry into regional phase | 27.07.2021 | National basic fee paid | 27.07.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.07.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.07.2021 | Examination requested [2021/47] | 27.07.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 19.04.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time | 22.06.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Request for further processing for: | 22.06.2022 | Request for further processing filed | 22.06.2022 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 27.06.2022 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [YD]WO0212455 (AVIGEN INC [US]) [YD] 1-19 * abstract *; | [XY]WO2016004319 (UNIV FLORIDA [US]) [X] 20-22 * abstract * * page 1, line 25 - page 5, line 18 * * page 9, line 8 - page 11, line 14 * * page 17, line 25 - page 19, line 19 * * page 39, line 23 - page 40, line 8; figure 1; example 1 * [Y] 1-19; | [XY]WO2017201258 (VOYAGER THERAPEUTICS INC [US]) [X] 20-22 * abstract * * paragraph [0029] - paragraph [0040] * * paragraph [0417] - paragraph [0452] * * paragraph [0453] - paragraph [0471] * * paragraph [0498] - paragraph [0535]; examples 1,8; table 11 * [Y] 1-19; | [Y] - NEGRETE ET AL, "Production of recombinant adeno-associated vectors using two bioreactor configurations at different scales", JOURNAL OF VIROLOGICAL METHODS, ELSEVIER BV, NL, (20070831), vol. 145, no. 2, doi:10.1016/J.JVIROMET.2007.05.020, ISSN 0166-0934, pages 155 - 161, XP022226046 [Y] 1-19 * abstract * * page 156, column 1, paragraph 3 - page 157, column 1, paragraph 2 * * page 158, column 2, paragraph 4 - page 159, column 1, paragraph 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jviromet.2007.05.020 | [Y] - OTTO-WILHELM MERTEN, "AAV vector production: state of the art developments and remaining challenges", CELL AND GENE THERAPY INSIGHTS, (20161201), vol. 2, no. 5, doi:10.18609/cgti.2016.067, ISSN 2059-7800, pages 521 - 551, XP055649764 [Y] 1-19 * abstract * * page 533, column 2 - page 537, column 1, paragraph 1 * * page 542, column 2, paragraph 3 - page 543, column 2, paragraph 2; figure 4 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.18609/cgti.2016.067 | [Y] - WEIHONG QU ET AL, "Scalable Downstream Strategies for Purification of Recombinant Adeno- Associated Virus Vectors in Light of the Properties", CURRENT PHARMACEUTICAL BIOTECHNOLOGY, NL, (20150101), vol. 16, doi:10.2174/1389201016666150505122228, ISSN 1389-2010, pages 684 - 695, XP055533837 [Y] 1-19 * abstract * * page 685, column 1 * * figure 5; table 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.2174/1389201016666150505122228 | [Y] - R. M. KOTIN, "Large-scale recombinant adeno-associated virus production", HUMAN MOLECULAR GENETICS, (20110415), vol. 20, no. R1, doi:10.1093/hmg/ddr141, ISSN 0964-6906, pages R2 - R6, XP055016870 [Y] 1-19 * abstract * * page r4, column 1, paragraph 3 - page r5, column 1, paragraph 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/hmg/ddr141 | [Y] - CECCHINI S ET AL, "Toward exascale production of recombinant adeno-associated virus for gene transfer applications", GENE THERAPY, NATURE PUBLISHING GROUP, LONDON, GB, vol. 15, no. 11, doi:10.1038/GT.2008.61, ISSN 0969-7128, (20080601), pages 823 - 830, (20080410), XP002679918 [Y] 1-19 * abstract * * page 827, column 2, paragraph 5 - page 828, column 2, paragraph 1; figure 4 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/gt.2008.61 | [Y] - TAMAS VIRAG ET AL, "Producing Recombinant Adeno-Associated Virus in Foster Cells: Overcoming Production Limitations Using a Baculovirus-Insect Cell Expression Strategy", HUMAN GENE THERAPY, (20090801), vol. 20, no. 8, doi:10.1089/hum.2009.092, ISSN 1043-0342, pages 807 - 817, XP055052744 [Y] 1-19 * abstract * * page 811, column 1, paragraph 3 - column 2, paragraph 2 * * page 814, column 2, paragraph 2 - page 815; figure 4 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1089/hum.2009.092 | [A] - HANNA P LESCH ET AL, "Requirements for baculoviruses for clinical gene therapy applications", JOURNAL OF INVERTEBRATE PATHOLOGY, vol. 107, doi:10.1016/J.JIP.2011.05.010, ISSN 0022-2011, (20110101), pages S106 - S112, (20110506), XP028244451 [A] 1-22 * abstract * * page s108, column 2, paragraph 2 - page s109, column 1, paragraph 2; figure 1; table 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jip.2011.05.010 | [A] - AUCOIN MARC G ET AL, "Virus-like particle and viral vector production using the baculovirus expression vector system/insect cell system: adeno-associated virus-based products", ANTIBODY-DRUG CONJUGATES; IN: METHODS IN MOLECULAR BIOLOGY; ISSN 1064-3745; VOL. 1045; [METHODS IN MOLECULAR BIOLOGY; ISSN 1064-3745; VOL. 1045], HUMANA PRESS, US, (20070101), vol. 388, ISBN 978-1-62703-541-5, pages 281 - 296, XP009151013 [A] 1-22 * abstract * | by applicant | US4946778 | US5064764 | US5387484 | US5525491 | WO9617947 | WO9639530 | US5688676 | US5691176 | WO9810088 | WO9811244 | EP0835321 | US5741683 | US5756283 | US5856456 | WO9914354 | WO9915685 | EP0931158 | WO9947691 | EP0950111 | WO0024916 | WO0028004 | EP1015619 | WO0047757 | WO0055342 | US6143567 | US6143548 | US6146874 | US6156303 | WO0075353 | EP1064393 | US6180613 | US6194191 | US6204059 | US6211163 | WO0123001 | WO0123597 | US6258595 | US6261551 | US6265389 | US6270996 | US6274354 | US6281010 | WO0189583 | EP1163354 | US2002019050 | WO0212455 | EP1183380 | US6365394 | US6410300 | US2002081721 | US2002090717 | EP1226264 | US2002102714 | US6428988 | US6436394 | US6436708 | US6475769 | US6482634 | US6485966 | US6503888 | US6506379 | US2003032613 | US2003040101 | US2003073232 | US6555525 | US2003092161 | US6566118 | US2003119191 | US6593123 | US2003138772 | US6660521 | US6660514 | US6676935 | US6699706 | US6726907 | WO2004112727 | WO2005003332 | WO2005005610 | WO2005033321 | WO2005072364 | US6943019 | US6953690 | US2006003451 | US6995006 | US7015026 | EP1636370 | US7022519 | US7048920 | US7091030 | US7094604 | US2006211115 | US7125706 | US2007004042 | EP1752536 | US7198951 | WO2007046703 | US7223585 | US7238526 | US2007231303 | US7291498 | US7300797 | WO2007148971 | US7326555 | WO2008052322 | US7419956 | US7419817 | US7427396 | US7445930 | EP2018421 | US7491508 | US7510875 | US7579181 | WO2009104964 | US7588772 | US7588757 | US2009275107 | US7625570 | US7704721 | US2010130594 | US7732129 | US2010240739 | US7888096 | US7901921 | US2011136227 | US2011151434 | US7968333 | US2011171262 | US2011212529 | US2011229971 | US2011263027 | US8110351 | US8119611 | US8137948 | US8163543 | WO2012057363 | US8236495 | US8283151 | US2012264807 | US2013019580 | US2013023034 | US2013045186 | US8476418 | US8512981 | US8524446 | US2013323302 | US8614101 | EP2678433 | US8642314 | US2014087361 | US8685734 | US2014099666 | US8697417 | US8734809 | WO2014144229 | WO2014178863 | US2014359799 | US8946152 | WO2015038958 | US8999948 | US2015126590 | US2015159173 | WO2015121501 | US2015238550 | WO2015137802 | US9163261 | WO2015168666 | US2015315612 | US9193769 | WO2015191508 | US2015376607 | US2015376240 | US9233131 | US9238800 | US2016017295 | US2016017005 | US2016032254 | WO2016049230 | WO2016065001 | WO2016073693 | WO2016077687 | WO2016077689 | WO2016094783 | WO2016134375 | WO2016137949 | US9475845 | US2016369298 | WO2017015102 | WO2017023724 | WO2017058892 | US9624274 | WO2017066764 | WO2017075335 | WO2017083722 | US2017145405 | WO2017100671 | WO2017189963 | WO2017189959 | WO2017189964 | WO2017201258 | WO2017201248 | US2018258424 | WO2018204786 | WO2018204803 | WO2018204797 | - TRATSCHIN et al., Mol. Cell Biol., (19850000), vol. 5, no. 11, pages 3251 - 3260 | - GRIMM, Hum. Gene Ther., (19990000), vol. 10, no. 15, pages 2445 - 2450 | - CHIORINI et al., J. Vir., (19970000), vol. 71, pages 6823 - 33 | - SRIVASTAVA et al., J. Vir., (19830000), vol. 45, pages 555 - 64 | - CHIORINI et al., J. Vir., (19990000), vol. 73, pages 1309 - 1319 | - RUTLEDGC et al., J. Vir., (19980000), vol. 72, pages 309 - 319 | - WU et al., J. Vir., (20000000), vol. 74, pages 8635 - 47 | - PARRET, Nat. Med, (19970000), vol. 3, pages 1145 - 9 | - YU et al., Molecular Pain, (20110000), vol. 7, page 63 | - GILL et al., Gene Therapy, (20010000), vol. 8, pages 1323 - 1332 | - PASSINIWOLFE, J. Virol., (20010000), pages 12382 - 12392 | - DREWS et al., "Identification of evolutionary conserved, fimctional noncoding elements in the promoter region of the sodium channel gene SCN8A", Mamm Genome, (20070000), vol. 18, pages 723 - 731 | - RAYMOND et al., "Expression of Alternatively Spliced Sodium Channel a-subunit genes", Journal of Biological Chemistry, (20040000), vol. 279, no. 44, pages 46234 - 46241 | - THOMAS. G., Nature Reviews Molecular Cell Biology, (20020000), vol. 3, no. 10, pages 753 - 66 | - KIM, J.H. et al., PLoS One, (20110000), vol. 6, no. 4, page e 185s6 | - GEORGE. R.A. et al., Protein Engineering, (20020000), vol. 15, no. 11, pages 871 - 9 | - HUSTON, J.S et al., PNAS, (19880000), vol. 85, pages 5879 - 83 | - SHAN, D. et al., Journal of Immunology, (19990000), vol. 162, no. 11, pages 6589 - 95 | - N PULICHERLA et al., Molecular Therapy, (20110000), vol. 19, no. 6, pages 1070 - 1078 | - GRIMM et al., Journal of Virology, (20080000), vol. 82, no. 12, pages 5887 - 5911 | - DEVERMAN et al., Nature Biotechnology, (20160000), vol. 34, no. 2, pages 204 - 209 | - CHAN et al., Nature Neuroscience, (20170000), vol. 20, no. 8, pages 1172 - 1179 | - JIN. et al., "Direct Liquid Chromatography/Mass Spectrometry Analysis for Complete Characterization of Recombinant Adeno-Associated Virus Capsid Proteins", Hum Gene Ther Methods, (20171000), vol. 28, no. 5, pages 255 - 267 | - HWANG et al., "N-Terminal Acetylation of Cellular Proteins Creates Specific Degradation Signals", Science, (20100219), vol. 327, no. 5968, doi:10.1126/science.1183147, pages 973 - 977, XP055369420 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.1183147 | - ELBASHIR SM et al., Nature, (20010000), vol. 411, pages 494 - 498 | - SHEEHAN B, Ther Adv Neurol Disord, (20120000), vol. 5, no. 6, pages 349 - 358 | - T. E. CREIGHTON, Proteins: Structure and Molecular Properties, W.H. Freeman & Co., (19830000), pages 79 - 86 | - J. Mol Biol, (19970000), vol. 266, no. 4, pages 814 - 830 | - STILWELLSAMULSKI et al., Biotechniques, (20030000), vol. 34, page 148 | - STEPHEN F. ALTSCHULTHOMAS L. MADDENALEJANDRO A. SCHAFFERJINGHUI ZHANGZHENG ZHANGWEBB MILLERDAVID J. LIPMAN, "Gapped BLAST and PSI-BLAST: a new generation of protein database search programs", Nucleic Acids Res., (19970000), vol. 25, doi:10.1093/nar/25.17.3389, pages 3389 - 3402, XP002905950 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/nar/25.17.3389 | - KOZAK, M, Cell, (19860131), vol. 44, no. 2, pages 283 - 92 | - KOZAK, M., J Cell Biol., (19890200), vol. 108, no. 2, pages 229 - 41 | - KOZAK, M., Mamm Genome, (19960800), vol. 7, no. 8, pages 563 - 74 | - CLARK et al., Hum. Gene Ther, (19990000), vol. 10, pages 1031 - 1039 | - VELDWIJK et al., Mol. Ther., (20020000), vol. 6, pages 272 - 278 | - SAMULSKI et al., J. Vir, (19890000), vol. 63, pages 3822 - 8 | - KAJIGAYA et al., Proc Nat'l. Acad. Sci USA, (19910000), vol. 88, pages 4646 - 50 | - RUFFING et al., J. Vir., (19920000), vol. 66, pages 6922 - 30 | - KIMBAUER et al., Vir., (19960000), vol. 219, pages 37 - 44 | - ZHAO et al., Vir., (20000000), vol. 272, pages 382 - 93 | - LUCKOW et al., Bio/Technology, (19880000), vol. 6, page 47 | - URABE. M. et al., J Virol., (20060200), vol. 80, no. 4, pages 1874 - 85 | - WASILKO DJ et al., Protein Expr Purif., (20090600), vol. 65, no. 2, pages 122 - 32 | - FENG, L. et al., Biotechnol Appl Biochem., (20080000), vol. 50, pages 121 - 32 | - SMITH, R.H. et al., Mol. Ther., (20090000), vol. 17, no. 11, pages 1888 - 96 | - KOTIN. R.M., Human Molecular Genetics, (20110000), vol. 20, no. 1, pages R2 - R6 | - MATHUPALA, Expert Opin Ther Pat., (20090000), vol. 19, pages 137 - 140 | - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Database accession no. 7647-14-15 | - POTTER et al., Cerebrovasc Dis., (20150100), vol. 39, no. 4, pages 224 - 231 | - MACLULLICH et al., J Neurol Neurosurg Psychiatry, (20041100), vol. 75, no. 11, pages 1519 - 23 | - VINCENT et al., Neuromotecular medicine, (20040000), vol. 6, pages 79 - 85 | - WANG et al., J Neurosci., (20020000), vol. 22, pages 6920 - 6928 | - G. S. BANKER, Modem Pharmaceutics, Drugs and the Pharmaceutical Sciences, Marcel Dekker, New York, Inc., (19960000), vol. 72 | US19950462014 | US19950549489 | WO1996US10245 | WO1997US15716 | WO1997US15691 | WO1998US19479 | WO1998US19463 | WO1999US05870 | WO2000US00415 | WO2000US04755 | US20000659203 | WO2000US40872 | WO2004US16614 | US20050246447 | US20060465302 | WO2007US10055 | WO2018US42391 |