EP3938734 - METHOD, APPARATUS AND SYSTEM FOR NAVIGATING AUTONOMOUS VEHICLES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.12.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.09.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.12.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 18.09.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 29.02.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.12.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.01.2024 [2024/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ZF Friedrichshafen AG Löwentaler Strasse 20 88046 Friedrichshafen / DE | [2022/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ABELE, Marc Am Krähenhag 4 78315 Radolfzell / DE | 02 /
MOHR, Mark Dr. Alex-Frick-Weg 8 88069 Tettnang / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2022/03] | 01 /
ABELE, Marc 78315 Radolfzell / DE | ||
02 /
MOHR, Mark 88069 Tettnang / DE | Representative(s) | ZF Friedrichshafen AG Gewerblicher Rechtsschutz Löwentalerstraße 20 88046 Friedrichshafen / DE | [2022/03] | Application number, filing date | 20705648.2 | 12.02.2020 | [2022/03] | WO2020EP53512 | Priority number, date | DE201910203484 | 14.03.2019 Original published format: DE102019203484 | [2022/03] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020182391 | Date: | 17.09.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3938734 | Date: | 19.01.2022 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.09.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.09.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G01C21/00, B66F9/075, G01S17/89, G05B1/00, G05D1/02 | [2022/03] | CPC: |
G01C21/005 (EP,US);
B60W60/001 (US);
B66F9/0755 (EP);
G05D1/0234 (EP,US);
G05D1/0278 (US);
G05D1/0282 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/03] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN, VORRICHTUNG UND SYSTEM ZUR NAVIGATION AUTONOMER FAHRZEUGE | [2022/03] | English: | METHOD, APPARATUS AND SYSTEM FOR NAVIGATING AUTONOMOUS VEHICLES | [2022/03] | French: | PROCÉDÉ, DISPOSITIF ET SYSTÈME DE NAVIGATION DE VÉHICULES AUTONOMES | [2022/03] | Entry into regional phase | 09.08.2021 | National basic fee paid | 09.08.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.08.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.08.2021 | Examination requested [2022/03] | 09.08.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 06.04.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.08.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.12.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.03.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.08.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2024/01] | 31.08.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2024/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2006069470 (CAMPBELL PHILIP L [US], et al) [A] 2,3,5,10,11 * paragraphs [0001] , [0 21] , [0 23] , [0 32] - [0033] *; | [A]WO2018014088 (COMMW SCIENT IND RES ORG [AU], et al) [A] 4 * paragraphs [0001] , [00 4] , [0 59] - [0060] - [0 62] , [0 68] , [0 70] * * figures 1, 3-4 *; | [A]US2018096299 (JARVIS DANIEL [US], et al) [A] 5* paragraphs [0002] , [00 6] , [0 63] *; | [A]US2018339890 (PERLSTEIN ZACHARY [US]) [A] 2,3,10,11 * paragraphs [0001] , [ 178] - [0187] *; | [XI] - CARDARELLI ELENA ET AL, "Cooperative cloud robotics architecture for the coordination of multi-AGV systems in industrial warehouses", MECHATRONICS, PERGAMON PRESS, OXFORD, GB, (20170512), vol. 45, doi:10.1016/J.MECHATRONICS.2017.04.005, ISSN 0957-4158, pages 1 - 13, XP085144428 [X] 1,6-9 * Kapitel 1. Introduction, 1. Abs., Kapitel 2.3. Perception System, S.3, letzter Abs., - S.5, 1. Abs., Kap. 2.4. Global Live View, 1. Abs, Kap. 4.1. Geometric fusion, letzter Abs., Abb. 1-2, 5A, 5B, 6 * [I] 2-5,10,11 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.mechatronics.2017.04.005 | by applicant | DE102016108446 |