EP3924105 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING MOTOR VEHICLE EXHAUST GAS CATALYSTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.11.2021 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 22.08.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 29.02.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.03.2024 | Change - applicant | published on 24.04.2024 [2024/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Umicore AG & Co. KG Rodenbacher Chaussee 4 63457 Hanau-Wolfgang / DE | [2024/17] |
Former [2021/51] | For all designated states UMICORE AG & Co. KG Rodenbacher Chaussee 4 63457 Hanau-Wolfgang / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FOERSTER, Martin An der Schildwache 26 63654 Buedingen / DE | 02 /
KOCH, Juergen Heinrich-Boell-Weg 11 63457 Hanau / DE | 03 /
MUELLER, Astrid Keplerstrasse 17 60318 Frankfurt / DE | 04 /
MASSON, Stéphane Rue des Mésanges 2 68128 Village Neuf / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2021/51] | 01 /
FOERSTER, Martin 63654 Buedingen / DE | ||
02 /
KOCH, Juergen 63457 Hanau / DE | |||
03 /
MUELLER, Astrid 60318 Frankfurt / DE | |||
04 /
MASSON, Stéphane 68128 Village Neuf / FR | Application number, filing date | 20705672.2 | 14.02.2020 | [2021/51] | WO2020EP53837 | Priority number, date | DE201910103765 | 14.02.2019 Original published format: DE102019103765 | [2021/51] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020165387 | Date: | 20.08.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3924105 | Date: | 22.12.2021 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.08.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.08.2020 | Classification | IPC: | B01J35/04, B01J37/02, B01D53/94, B05D7/00 | [2021/51] | CPC: |
B01J35/56 (EP,US);
B01J37/0215 (EP,US);
B01J37/0236 (EP,US);
B01J37/0244 (EP,US);
B01J37/08 (US);
F01N2370/04 (US);
F01N2610/03 (US);
F01N3/101 (US);
F01N3/2066 (US);
Y02T10/12 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/51] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON AUTOABGASKATALYSATOREN | [2021/51] | English: | METHOD FOR PRODUCING MOTOR VEHICLE EXHAUST GAS CATALYSTS | [2021/51] | French: | PROCÉDÉ POUR LA FABRICATION DE CATALYSEURS DE GAZ D'ÉCHAPPEMENT DE VÉHICULE | [2021/51] | Entry into regional phase | 14.09.2021 | National basic fee paid | 14.09.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.09.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.09.2021 | Examination requested [2021/51] | 14.09.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]JPH1128366 (BABCOCK HITACHI KK) [X] 1,2,4-7,9-11 * abstract * * figures 1-4 * [I] 3,8; | [XI]JP2007268484 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP) [X] 1,2,4-7,9-11 * abstract * * figures 1, 2, 5, 7 * [I] 3,8; | [XI]JP2015058406 (CATALER CORP) [X] 1-7,10,11 * abstract * * figure 1 * [I] 8,9; | [XI]US2018250630 (FUKUYO SHOKO [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,4-7,9-11 * abstract * * paragraph [0003] * * paragraphs [0045] - [0069] * * paragraph [0085]; figures 3-12; example 1; claim - *[I] 3,8 | by applicant | JPS5925101B | EP0398128 | WO9947260 | US6596056 | WO2004024407 | EP1136462 | US7094728 | EP1900442 | WO2008106519 | WO2011151711 | EP2415522 | EP2521618 | WO2014126675 | WO2015121910 | WO2015145122 | WO2016023808 | WO2016057285 | WO2017153239 | US2017274412 | US9849469 | WO2018020777 | JP2018103131 |