EP3935545 - INCREMENTAL DECRYPTION AND INTEGRITY VERIFICATION OF A SECURE OPERATING SYSTEM IMAGE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 17.11.2023 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 10.07.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.12.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 18.09.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 29.02.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation New Orchard Road Armonk, New York 10504 / US | [2022/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BUENDGEN, Reinhard c/o IBM Deutschland Research & Development GmbH Schoenaicher Strasse 220 71032 Boeblingen / DE | 02 /
BORNTRAEGER, Christian c/o IBM Deutschland Research & Development GmbH Schoenaicher Strasse 220 71032 Boeblingen / DE | 03 /
BRADBURY, Jonathan c/o IBM Corp. 2455 South Road Poughkeepsie, New York 12601 / US | 04 /
BUSABA, Fadi c/o IBM Corp. 2455 South Road Poughkeepsie, New York 12601 / US | 05 /
HELLER, Lisa c/o IBM Corp. 2455 South Road Poughkeepsie, New York 12601 / US | 06 /
MIHAJLOVSKI, Viktor c/o IBM Deutschland Research & Development GmbH Schoenaicher Strasse 220 71032 Boeblingen / DE | [2023/51] |
Former [2022/02] | 01 /
BUENDGEN, Reinhard 71032 Boeblingen / DE | ||
02 /
BORNTRAEGER, Christian 71032 Boeblingen / DE | |||
03 /
BRADBURY, Jonathan Poughkeepsie, New York 12601 / US | |||
04 /
BUSABA, Fadi Poughkeepsie, New York 12601 / US | |||
05 /
HELLER, Lisa Poughkeepsie, New York 12601 / US | |||
06 /
MIHAJLOVSKI, Viktor 71032 Boeblingen / DE | Representative(s) | Laux, Felix Michael IBM Deutschland GmbH Patentwesen u. Urheberrecht Schönaicher Straße 220 71032 Böblingen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2022/02] | Laux, Felix Michael IBM Deutschland GmbH Patentwesen u. Urheberrecht IBM-Allee 1 71139 Ehningen / DE | Application number, filing date | 20705701.9 | 17.02.2020 | [2022/02] | WO2020EP54101 | Priority number, date | US201916296334 | 08.03.2019 Original published format: US201916296334 | [2022/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020182420 | Date: | 17.09.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3935545 | Date: | 12.01.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.09.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3935545 | Date: | 20.12.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.09.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G06F21/57, G06F9/4401, G06F9/455 | [2023/31] | CPC: |
G06F21/575 (EP,IL,US);
G06F21/577 (IL,US);
G06F21/57 (IL,KR);
G06F21/64 (IL,KR);
G06F9/4406 (EP,IL,KR,US);
G06F9/45558 (EP,IL,KR,US);
|
Former IPC [2022/02] | G06F21/57, G06F9/455 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/02] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | INKREMENTALE ENTSCHLÜSSELUNG UND INTEGRITÄTSPRÜFUNG EINES SICHEREN BETRIEBSSYSTEMS | [2022/02] | English: | INCREMENTAL DECRYPTION AND INTEGRITY VERIFICATION OF A SECURE OPERATING SYSTEM IMAGE | [2022/02] | French: | DÉCHIFFREMENT INCRÉMENTAL ET VÉRIFICATION D'INTÉGRITÉ D'UNE IMAGE DE SYSTÈME D'EXPLOITATION SÉCURISÉE | [2022/02] | Entry into regional phase | 01.10.2021 | National basic fee paid | 01.10.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.10.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.10.2021 | Examination requested [2022/02] | 01.10.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 20.04.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.07.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.11.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 10.11.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 10.11.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HR | 20.12.2023 | RS | 20.12.2023 | [2024/26] | Cited in | International search | [A]US2011302400 (MAINO FABIO R [US], et al); | [X]EP3367287 (INTEL CORP [US]) |