EP3927537 - MOULD TOOL FOR MANUFACTURE OF A WIND TURBINE BLADE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 15.09.2024 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 26.05.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.11.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 28.08.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 04.03.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.09.2024 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Blade Dynamics Limited Unit D Omega Enterprise Park Chandlers Ford Eastleigh Hampshire SO53 4SE / GB | For all designated states LM Wind Power A/S Jupitervej 6 6000 Kolding / DK | [2021/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LUND-LAVERICK, Michael c/o LM Wind Power A/S Jupitervej 6 6000 Kolding / DK | 02 /
JESPERSEN, Klavs c/o LM Wind Power A/S Jupitervej 6 6000 Kolding / DK | 03 /
RAZEGHI, Rama c/o Blade Dynamics Limited Unit D Omega Enterprise Park, Chandlers Ford Eastleigh, Hampshire SO53 4SE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2021/52] | 01 /
LUND-LAVERICK, Michael 6000 Kolding / DK | ||
02 /
JESPERSEN, Klavs 6000 Kolding / DK | |||
03 /
RAZEGHI, Rama Eastleigh, Hampshire SO53 4SE / GB | Representative(s) | COPA Copenhagen Patents Rosenørns Allé 1, 2nd floor 1970 Frederiksberg C / DK | [2021/52] | Application number, filing date | 20706261.3 | 21.02.2020 | [2021/52] | WO2020EP54647 | Priority number, date | GB20190002448 | 22.02.2019 Original published format: GB 201902448 | [2021/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020169815 | Date: | 27.08.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3927537 | Date: | 29.12.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.08.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.08.2020 | Classification | IPC: | B29D99/00, B29C70/44, B29C33/34 | [2021/52] | CPC: |
B29D99/0028 (EP,US);
B29C70/44 (EP,US);
B29C33/34 (EP,US);
B29L2031/085 (US);
Y02P70/50 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/52] | Validation states | MA | 17.09.2021 | Title | German: | FORMWERKZEUG ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER WINDTURBINENSCHAUFEL | [2021/52] | English: | MOULD TOOL FOR MANUFACTURE OF A WIND TURBINE BLADE | [2021/52] | French: | OUTIL DE MOULAGE POUR LA FABRICATION D'UNE PALE D'ÉOLIENNE | [2021/52] | Entry into regional phase | 17.09.2021 | National basic fee paid | 17.09.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.09.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.09.2021 | Examination requested [2021/52] | 17.09.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 28.03.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.05.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.08.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.02.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.06.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.09.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]WO2011012145 (STENDAL TECHNOLOGIES GMBH [DE], et al); | [A]WO2012126479 (VESTAS WIND SYS AS [DK], et al) |