EP3931185 - POLYISOCYANURATE MATERIALS AS ELECTRICAL POTTING COMPOUNDS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 30.05.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.12.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 04.09.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 04.03.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.05.2024 | First examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Covestro Deutschland AG Kaiser-Wilhelm-Allee 60 51373 Leverkusen / DE | [2024/04] |
Former [2022/01] | For all designated states Covestro Intellectual Property GmbH & Co. KG Kaiser-Wilhelm-Allee 60 51373 Leverkusen / DE | ||
For all designated states Covestro Deutschland AG Kaiser-Wilhelm-Allee 60 51373 Leverkusen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MATNER, Mathias Lützowstraße 16h 41464 Neuss / DE | 02 /
EHLERS, Michael Körnerstrasse 12 A 47829 Krefeld / DE | 03 /
ACHTEN, Dirk Salamanderweg 43 51375 Leverkusen / DE | 04 /
ROTT, Ralf Maurinusstr. 58 51381 Leverkusen / DE | 05 /
ARHEDEN, Bengt c/o Plixxent A/S Kronborgvej 24 5450 Otterup / DK | [N/P] |
Former [2022/01] | 01 /
MATNER, Mathias 41464 Neuss / DE | ||
02 /
EHLERS, Michael 47829 Krefeld / DE | |||
03 /
ACHTEN, Dirk 51375 Leverkusen / DE | |||
04 /
ROTT, Ralf 51381 Leverkusen / DE | |||
05 /
ARHEDEN, Bengt 5450 Otterup / DK | Representative(s) | Levpat c/o Covestro AG Gebäude K12 51365 Leverkusen / DE | [2022/01] | Application number, filing date | 20706286.0 | 26.02.2020 | [2022/01] | WO2020EP55037 | Priority number, date | EP20190159839 | 27.02.2019 Original published format: EP 19159839 | [2022/01] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020174009 | Date: | 03.09.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3931185 | Date: | 05.01.2022 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.09.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.09.2020 | Classification | IPC: | C07D251/34, C08G18/48, C08G18/73, C08K3/34, C08G18/02, C08G18/10, C08G18/16, C08G18/18, C08G18/22 | [2022/01] | CPC: |
C08G18/022 (EP,KR);
C08G18/10 (EP,KR,US);
C07D251/30 (EP);
C07D273/04 (EP);
C08G18/161 (US);
C08G18/163 (EP,KR);
C08G18/168 (EP,KR,US);
C08G18/1825 (EP,KR);
C08G18/225 (EP,US);
C08G18/2825 (US);
C08G18/4825 (EP,KR,US);
C08G18/73 (EP,KR,US);
C08G18/7671 (US);
C08K3/013 (KR);
C08K3/26 (EP);
C08K3/34 (EP);
C08K3/36 (US);
C08K9/06 (EP);
B29C39/10 (US);
B29K2075/00 (US);
B29L2031/3406 (US);
| C-Set: |
C08G18/10, C08G18/022 (EP);
C08K3/26, C08L75/08 (EP);
C08K3/34, C08L75/08 (EP);
C08K9/06, C08L75/08 (EP) | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/01] | Title | German: | POLYISOCYANURATWERKSTOFFE ALS ELEKTROVERGUSSMASSEN | [2022/01] | English: | POLYISOCYANURATE MATERIALS AS ELECTRICAL POTTING COMPOUNDS | [2022/01] | French: | MATÉRIAUX DE POLYISOCYANURATE COMME MASSES DE SCELLEMENT ÉLECTRIQUES | [2022/01] | Entry into regional phase | 27.09.2021 | National basic fee paid | 27.09.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.09.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.09.2021 | Examination requested [2022/01] | 27.09.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 12.05.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time | 19.05.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.05.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Request for further processing for: | 19.05.2022 | Request for further processing filed | 19.05.2022 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 07.06.2022 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]WO2014147072 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [X] 1,3-13 * claim 1 * * Beispiel; page 26 *[A] 2; | [A]US2015344726 (RADEMACHER JOSEF [DE], et al) [A] 1-13 * page 10, paragraph [0125] * | International search | [XA]WO2014147072 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [X] 1,3-13 * claim 1 * * Beispiel; page 26 *[A] 2; | [A]US2015344726 (RADEMACHER JOSEF [DE], et al) [A] 1-13 * page 10, paragraph [0125] * | by applicant | GB809809 | DE1954093 | DE1670666 | DE1667309 | GB1386399 | GB1391066 | DE2414413 | DE2452532 | DE2631733 | DE2641380 | EP0003765 | EP0010589 | EP0013880 | EP0033581 | EP0047452 | EP0056158 | EP0056159 | DE3219608 | EP0100129 | EP0102482 | DE3240613 | DE3700209 | US4789705 | EP0330966 | EP0336205 | EP0339396 | GB2221465 | GB2222161 | DE3900053 | EP0379914 | DE3928503 | EP0443167 | EP0668271 | EP0671426 | EP0798299 | EP0896009 | WO9923128 | EP0962455 | EP1229016 | EP1422223 | WO2005087828 | EP1599526 | EP1982979 | WO2013167404 | WO2014147072 | WO2015166983 | US2015344726 | WO2016170059 | WO2017191175 | - European Polymer Journal, (19800000), vol. 16, pages 147 - 148 | - J. Prakt. Chem., (19940000), vol. 336, pages 185 - 200 | - Justus Liebigs Annalen der Chemie, (19490000), vol. 562, pages 75 - 136 | - European Polymer Journal, (19790000), vol. 16, pages 147 - 148 | - J. H. SAUNDERSK. C. FRISCH, Polyurethanes Chemistry and Technology, (19620000), page 94 ff | EP20130196508 |